Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3237644

EP3237644 - CELL IDENTIFICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
14.09.2019New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[2017/44]
Inventor(s)01 / BENKIRANE, Monsef
2, clos du petit Paris
34980 Saint Gely Du Fesc / FR
02 / PETITJEAN, Gaël
33, rue du Truel
34090 Montpellier / FR
 [2017/44]
Representative(s)Monni, Richard
Cabinet LLR
11 boulevard de Sébastopol
75001 Paris / FR
[2017/44]
Application number, filing date15830803.117.12.2015
[2017/44]
WO2015FR53579
Priority number, dateFR2014006313822.12.2014         Original published format: FR 1463138
[2017/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016102829
Date:30.06.2016
Language:FR
[2016/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3237644
Date:01.11.2017
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/70
[2017/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/44]
TitleGerman:ZELLIDENTIFIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2017/44]
English:CELL IDENTIFICATION METHOD[2017/44]
French:MÉTHODE D'IDENTIFICATION DE CELLULES.[2017/44]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2017National basic fee paid 
28.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/44]
28.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.09.2019
18.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1715053  (FRANKGEN BIOTECHNOLOGIE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * claim 1 * * abstract * * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013148197  (OTT MELANIE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * * abstract * * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006067572  (UNIV WITWATERSRAND JHB [ZA], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 26 * * abstract * * the whole document *
 [IA]  - Ilona Hauber ET AL, "Highly Significant Antiviral Activity of HIV-1 LTR-Specific Tre-Recombinase in Humanized Mice", PLoS Pathogens, San Francisco, vol. 9, no. 9, doi:10.1371/journal.ppat.1003587, (20130926), pages 1 - 18, URL: http://search.proquest.com/docview/1442426778, (20150727), XP055093779 [I] 1-9 * figures 1-2 * * abstract * * the whole document * [A] 10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1003587
 [A]  - N. R. WALL ET AL, "Monosynaptic circuit tracing in vivo through Cre-dependent targeting and complementation of modified rabies virus", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20101214), vol. 107, no. 50, doi:10.1073/pnas.1011756107, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 21848 - 21853, XP055204511 [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1011756107
 [A]  - GREGORY M. LAIRD ET AL, "Rapid Quantification of the Latent Reservoir for HIV-1 Using a Viral Outgrowth Assay", PLOS PATHOGENS, (20130530), vol. 9, no. 5, doi:10.1371/journal.ppat.1003398, page e1003398, XP055204081 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1003398
by applicantWO2013148197
 US2009010941
    - BACHRACHA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2005), vol. 332, no. 1, pages 418 - 429
    - NALDINI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 272, no. 5259, pages 263 - 267
    - VERHOEYEN ET AL., HUM GENE THER., (2012), vol. 23, no. 7, pages 754 - 68
    - MANGEOT ET AL., MOL. THER., (2002), vol. 5, pages 283 - 290
    - LUCHE ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL., (200701), vol. 37, no. 1, pages 43 - 53
    - MCDONNEL ET AL., RETROVIROLOGY, (2013), vol. 10, page 69
    - MCDONNEL ET AL., VIRUSES, (2012), vol. 4, pages 878 - 888
    - WONGSRIKEO ET AL., NAT METHODS, (20110911), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 853 - 9