Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3236741

EP3236741 - MICROCOSM FOR PLANT GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/44]A MICROCOSM FOR RAISING PLANTS UNDER BIOTIC AND ABIOTIC CONDITIONING
[2018/33]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HR, LV, RS
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENEA - Agenzia Nazionale per le Nuove Tecnologie, l'Energia e lo Sviluppo Economico Sostenibile
Lungotevere G.A. Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma (RM) / IT
For all designated states
FOS S.r.l.
Via Porlezza 16
20123 Milano / IT
For all designated states
Sesmat S.r.l.
SS7 Appia 36
82018 San Giorgio del Sannio (BN) / IT
[2018/42]
Former [2017/44]For all designated states
Agenzia Nazionale Per Le Nuove Tecnologie, L'Energia E Lo Sviluppo Economico Sostenibile (ENEA)
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
For all designated states
FOS S.r.l.
Via Porlezza 16
20123 Milano / IT
For all designated states
Sesmat S.r.l.
SS7 Appia 36
82018 San Giorgio del Sannio (BN) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / D'AQUINO, Luigi
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
02 / MINARINI, Carla
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
03 / LANZA, Bruno
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
04 / ATRIGNA, Mauro
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
05 / DE FILIPPO, Giovanni
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
06 / PANDOLFI, Giuseppe
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
07 / GIANNOTTA, Giovanni
Via Roma, 82
39100 Bolzano / IT
08 / PEDICINI, Antonio
Via Trescine, 12A
82030 Foglianise (BN) / IT
 [2019/10]
Former [2017/44]01 / D'AQUINO, Luigi
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
02 / MINARINI, Carla
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
03 / LANZA, Bruno
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
04 / ATRIGNA, Mauro
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
05 / DE FILIPPO, Giovanni
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
06 / PANDOLFI, Giuseppe
Lungotevere G.A.
Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
07 / GIANNOTTA, Giovanni
Via B. Telesio 2
20145 Milano / IT
08 / PEDICINI, Antonio
SS7 Appia 36
82018 San Giorgio del Sannio (BN) / IT
Representative(s)Sarpi, Maurizio , et al
Studio Ferrario S.r.l.
Via Collina, 36
00187 Roma / IT
[2017/44]
Application number, filing date15830853.621.12.2015
[2017/44]
WO2015IB59835
Priority number, dateIT2014RM0074322.12.2014         Original published format: IT RM20140743
[2017/44]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016103152
Date:30.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3236741
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016
[2017/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3236741
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/00, A01G9/00
[2018/33]
Former International [2017/44]A01G9/00, G01N33/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MIKROKOSMOS FÜR PFLANZENWACHSTUM[2018/33]
English:MICROCOSM FOR PLANT GROWTH[2018/33]
French:MICROCOSME POUR LA CROISSANCE DES PLANTES[2018/33]
Former [2017/44]MIKROKOSMOS ZUM ZÜCHTEN VON PFLANZEN UNTER BIOTISCHEN UND ABIOTISCHEN BEDINGUNGEN
Former [2017/44]A MICROCOSM FOR RAISING PLANTS UNDER BIOTIC AND ABIOTIC CONDITIONING
Former [2017/44]MICROCOSME POUR CULTIVER DES PLANTES DANS DES CONDITIONS BIOTIQUES ET ABIOTIQUES
Entry into regional phase12.07.2017National basic fee paid 
12.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/44]
12.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2019Fee for grant paid
23.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/38]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/35]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]DE19905734  (GSF FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM UMWELT [DE]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - column 7, line 39 *;
 [A]EP1074838  (GSF FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM UMWELT [DE]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] *;
 [A]CN201662570U  (NANJING INST OF ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCES MEP) [A] 1,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]RU2038747  (ABRAMOV ZAKHAR T [RU]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantCN201662570U
 GB2160406
 JP2013165658
 US2005277169
 US2007277744
    - WENT F.W., "The Earhart Plant Research Laboratory", CHRONICA BOTANICA, (1950), vol. 12, pages 91 - 108
    - WENT F.W., THE EXPERIMENTAL CONTROL OF PLANT GROWTH, (1957), page 343