Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3285822

EP3285822 - INTEGRAL ARTIFICIAL HEART DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CZ
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plas, Gérard
Valboissiére Ch No.13
34190 Brissac / FR
For all designated states
Plas, Corentin
Valboissiére Ch N°13
34190 Brissac / FR
For all designated states
Plas, Gwen Sébastien
Forest Park Circle
Penn Valley, CA 95946 / US
[2019/25]
Former [2018/09]For all designated states
Plas, Gérard
Valboissiére Ch No.13
34190 Brissac / FR
For all designated states
Plas, Corentin
Valboissiére Ch N°13
34190 Brissac / FR
For all designated states
Plas, Gwen Sébastien
Forest Park Circle
Penn Valley, CA 95946 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2018/09]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2019/25]
Former [2018/09]Cornuejols, Georges
Cassiopi
230 Avenue de l'Aube Rouge
34170 Castelnau-le-Lez / FR
Application number, filing date15831059.928.12.2015
[2018/09]
WO2015FR00243
Priority number, dateFR2015000000405.01.2015         Original published format: FR 1500004
FR2015000269724.12.2015         Original published format: FR 1502697
[2018/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016110613
Date:14.07.2016
Language:FR
[2016/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3285822
Date:28.02.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2016
[2018/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3285822
Date:19.06.2019
Language:FR
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/10
[2018/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTE KÜNSTLICHE HERZVORRICHTUNG[2018/09]
English:INTEGRAL ARTIFICIAL HEART DEVICE[2018/09]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COEUR ARTIFICIEL INTÉGRAL[2018/09]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2017National basic fee paid 
20.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2017Examination requested  [2018/09]
24.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2018Fee for grant paid
05.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201703   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2018
31.12.201804   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2019
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/07]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/52]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]US4152785  (SHUMAKOV VALERY I ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US3771173  (LAMB E) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US3919722  (HARMISON LOWELL T) [A] 1 * abstract *