Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3195448

EP3195448 - SELF-AWARE, SOFTWARE DEFINED, DIGITAL POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Softiron Limited
One Venture Road
Science Park
Southampton
Hampshire SO16 7NP / GB
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / STRAW, Phil
6540 Central Avenue
Fremont, California 94560 / US
02 / PRESTON, Gary
30 Bryan Road
Blackpool Lancashire FY3 9BE / GB
03 / FRASER, Norman
72 Downs Wood
Epsom Surrey KT18 5UL / GB
04 / CHEN, Mark
37087 Arden Street
Newark, California 94560 / US
 [2017/30]
Representative(s)Clarke, Geoffrey Howard
Lane IP Limited The Forum St Paul's
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/30]Grant, David Michael
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15831416.111.08.2015
[2017/30]
WO2015US44731
Priority number, dateUS201462036025P11.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462036025 P
[2017/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016025531
Date:18.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3195448
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2016
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.02.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:H02J9/00, H02J7/34
[2018/10]
Former International [2017/30]H02J9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
TitleGerman:SELBSTBEWUSSTE, SOFTWAREDEFINIERTE, DIGITALE STROMVERSORGUNG[2017/30]
English:SELF-AWARE, SOFTWARE DEFINED, DIGITAL POWER SUPPLY[2017/30]
French:ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE NUMÉRIQUE AUTONOME DÉFINIE PAR UN LOGICIEL[2017/30]
Entry into regional phase24.02.2017National basic fee paid 
24.02.2017Search fee paid 
24.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
24.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US6424119  (NELSON JAMES E [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 67; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]US2005121979  (MATSUMOTO ATSUO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 *;
 [X]CN2646772Y  (ZHONG YULIN [CN]) [X] 1,2 * page 3 - page 4; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]EP2658081  (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014]; figure 1 *
International search[Y]JP2014050277  (RICOH CO LTD) [Y] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0085], Figs. 1-14 (No Family) *;
 [Y]JP2004148241  (MEIKO SHOKAI CO LTD) [Y] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0010]-[0026] (No Family) *;
 [A]JPS63228968  (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-2 * , page 1, lower right column, line 11 to page 2, upper left column, line 15, Fig. 2 (No Family) *