Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3181891

EP3181891 - IGNITION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.07.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Imagineering, Inc.
7-4-4, Minatojimaminami-machi Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-0047 / JP
[2017/25]
Inventor(s)01 / IKEDA, Yuji
c/o IMAGINEERING Inc.
7-4-4 Minatojimaminami-machi
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-0047 / JP
02 / OHTSUBO, Hidekazu
c/o IMAGINEERING Inc.
7-4-4 Minatojimaminami-machi
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-0047 / JP
 [2017/25]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2017/25]Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date15832320.410.08.2015
[2017/25]
WO2015JP72615
Priority number, dateJP2014016460112.08.2014         Original published format: JP 2014164601
[2017/25]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016024563
Date:18.02.2016
Language:JA
[2016/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3181891
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.02.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:F02P23/04, F02P3/01, H01T13/44, H05H1/52
[2017/45]
Former International [2017/25]F02P23/04, F02P3/01, H01T13/20, H01T13/32, H01T13/40, H05H1/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/25]
TitleGerman:ZÜNDVORRICHTUNG[2017/25]
English:IGNITION DEVICE[2017/25]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ALLUMAGE[2017/25]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2017Translation filed 
03.03.2017National basic fee paid 
03.03.2017Search fee paid 
03.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/25]
03.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201905   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2014115707  (IMAGINEERING INC [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-4,7,8 *;
 [A]EP2754884  (IMAGINEERING INC [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [A]US2014202412  (IKEDA YUJI [JP]) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1,3-5 *;
 [A]US2010192909  (IKEDA YUJI [JP]) [A] 1,4 * paragraphs [0092] , [0142] * * figures 1,4,13-15 *;
 [A]US2009120394  (HEISE VOLKER [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
International search[A]JP2009038025  (IMAGINEERING KK) [A] 1-4 * , & US 2010/0186670 A1 & WO 2009/008517 A1 & EP 2178350 A1 *;
 [A]JP2006132518  (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [A] 1-4 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010520400  (Renault S.A.S.) [A] 1-4 * , & US 2010/0313841 A1 & WO 2008/113956 A2 & EP 2126342 A2 & FR 2913299 A1 & CN 101627206 A & KR 10-2009-0115946 A & RU 2009136348 A & BRA PI0808177 A2 *;
 [A]JP2009281188  (AET INC) [A] 1-4 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2009115093  (DELPHI TECH INC) [A] 1-4 * , & US 2009/0120394 A1 & EP 2058909 A1 & AT 544209 T *