Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3199676

EP3199676 - YARN, FABRIC MANUFACTURED USING SAME, AND PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  01.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 13.03.2019  [2019/11]
08.02.2019Change - extension statespublished on 13.03.2019  [2019/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clembon Co., Ltd.
6th Floor, 269, Dapsimni-ro
Dongdaemun-gu
Seoul 02530 / KR
[2017/31]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Hyun Sam
101-dong 2003-ho
266
World cup-daero
Yeonje-gu
Busan 47509 / KR
02 / CHOI, Sung Hoon
205-dong 1805-ho
65
Sagajeong-ro
Dongdaemun-gu
Seoul 02553 / KR
 [2017/31]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/31]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date15832777.502.12.2015
[2017/31]
WO2015KR13098
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017094931
Date:08.06.2017
Language:KO
[2017/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3199676
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:D02G1/16, D02G3/04, D01F8/00, D03D1/00, D03D15/00, D02J1/08, D02G1/20, A47L13/256
[2018/22]
Former International [2017/31]D02G1/16, D02G3/04, D01F8/00, D03D1/00, D03D15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/31]
TitleGerman:GARN UND STOFFE UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE PRODUKTE[2017/31]
English:YARN, FABRIC MANUFACTURED USING SAME, AND PRODUCT[2017/31]
French:FIL, TISSU FABRIQUÉ L'UTILISANT ET PRODUIT[2017/31]
Entry into regional phase23.02.2016Translation filed 
23.02.2016National basic fee paid 
23.02.2016Search fee paid 
23.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2016Examination requested  [2017/31]
23.02.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4100725  (MAGEL BERNARD) [X] 1-12,14 * column 4, lines 11-42; examples 9,21,25; claims 1,7,29 * * column 7, lines 12-25 * [Y] 15,16;
 [XY]US3104516  (FIELD JR FREDERICK CROMWELL) [X] 1-7,13,14 * column 6, line 73 - column 7, line 25; figures 1-4; example 5 * [Y] 15,16;
 [XY]JPH0797731  (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1-4,7,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0009] , [0029]; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [Y] 15,16;
 [Y]EP1496144  (N I TEIJIN SHOJI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 15,16 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2003089097  (LEE YOUNGKYU [KR], et al) [Y] 15,16 * abstract *
International search[XY]KR100737976B  (SAEHAN IND INC [KR]) [X] 1-7, 10, 11, 14-16 * See abstract; claim 1; pages 4-6; and figures 1-3. * [Y] 8, 9, 12, 13;
 [Y]KR100716623B  (CHOI SUNG HOON [KR]) [Y] 8, 9, 12 * See abstract; and page 5. *;
 [Y]KR101258053B  (CHOI JIN HWA [KR]) [Y] 13 * See abstract; claim 1; paragraph [0010]; and figures 1-3. *;
 [A]KR20140120730  (AN JEUNG SEOP [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * See abstract; claims 1, 2; and paragraphs [0007], [0012]-[0018]. *;
 [A]KR20140137559  (BOO NAM HAE [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See abstract; and claims 1-8. *;
 [E]KR20150136364  (CLEMBON CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-16 * See the entire document. *
by applicantKR100929510B
 KR100716623B