Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3354776

EP3354776 - FABRIC HAVING CUT-LOOP STRUCTURE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND PRODUCT USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 26.06.2019 [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clembon Co., Ltd.
6th Floor, 269, Dapsimni-ro
Dongdaemun-gu
Seoul 02530 / KR
[2018/31]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Hyun Sam
101-dong 2003-ho
266
World cup-daero
Yeonje-gu
Busan 47509 / KR
02 / CHOI, Sung Hoon
205-dong 1805-ho
65
Sagajeong-ro
Dongdaemun-gu
Seoul 02553 / KR
 [2018/31]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/31]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date15832780.902.12.2015
[2018/31]
WO2015KR13099
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017094932
Date:08.06.2017
Language:KO
[2017/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3354776
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:D03D11/00, D03D13/00, D03D15/00, D03D1/00, D03D27/00, A47L13/16, D04B21/04, D04B1/04, D02G3/34
[2019/25]
Former International [2018/31]D03D11/00, D03D13/00, D03D15/00, D03D1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/31]
TitleGerman:GEWEBE MIT CUT-LOOP-STRUKTUR, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ERZEUGNIS DAMIT[2018/31]
English:FABRIC HAVING CUT-LOOP STRUCTURE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND PRODUCT USING SAME[2018/31]
French:TISSU AYANT UNE STRUCTURE DE BOUCLÉ-COUPÉ, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET PRODUIT L'UTILISANT[2018/31]
Entry into regional phase23.02.2016Translation filed 
23.02.2016National basic fee paid 
23.02.2016Search fee paid 
23.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2016Examination requested  [2018/31]
23.02.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]KR101326213B  (CLEMBON CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-25 * See abstract; claims 1, 8; and paragraphs [0010], [0053]. *;
 [Y]KR100737976B  (SAEHAN IND INC [KR]) [Y] 1-25 * See abstract; claims 1, 2; and pages 4, 5. *;
 [Y]KR100716623B  (CHOI SUNG HOON [KR]) [Y] 5, 6, 8, 9, 15, 16, 22 , 25 * See abstract; claim 1; and pages 4, 5. *;
 [Y]KR101258053B  (CHOI JIN HWA [KR]) [Y] 10 * See abstract; and claim 1. *;
 [A]KR940014988  (TONG YANG POLYESTER CO., LTD.) [A] 1-25 * See abstract; and claims 1, 2. *;
 [E]KR20150136365  (CLEMBON CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-25 * See the entire document. *
by applicantKR100929510B
 KR100716623B