Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3182916

EP3182916 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SPHERICAL ABLATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / BRANNAN, Joseph D.
3045 Blue Sky Circle 18-201
Erie, Colorado 80516 / US
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Maschio & Soames IP Ltd
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[2017/26]
Application number, filing date15834303.820.08.2015
[2017/26]
WO2015US46122
Priority number, dateUS201462039793P20.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462039793 P
[2017/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016029022
Date:25.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3182916
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.02.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/18, A61B17/24, // A61B18/00
[2018/10]
Former International [2017/26]A61B18/18, A61B17/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR SPHÄRISCHE ABLATIONEN[2017/26]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SPHERICAL ABLATIONS[2017/26]
French:SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES D'ABLATIONS SPHÉRIQUES[2017/26]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2017National basic fee paid 
20.03.2017Search fee paid 
20.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/26]
20.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2014046174  (LADTKOW CASEY M [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0091] - [0188] * [I] 7,8,12,13;
 [A]US2011118724  (TURNER PAUL F [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0056] - [0098] *;
 [A]US2009187180  (BRANNAN JOSEPH D [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0064] *
International search[XYA]WO2013106054  (VIVANT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1, 10-14, 18-20 * , paragraphs [0027], [0029], [00124], [00132]-[00133], [00136], [00150]-[00151], [00164]-[00165], [00198], figs. 1-2, 6B & JP 2014-516616 A & US 2014/0039487 A1 * [Y] 2-9, 15 [A] 16-17;
 [YA]WO2014025549  (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [Y] 2-9 * paragraphs [0080], [00157]-[00158], fig. 30 & JP 2015-524340 A & US 2014/0046174 A1 * [A] 1, 10-20;
 [YA]WO0238038  (PULMONX [US]) [Y] 8-9, 15 * , page 5, lines 10-28, page 19, line 20-page 20, line 27, figs. 19A-21 & JP 2004-512893 A & US 2004/0073191 A1 * [A] 1-7, 10-14, 16-20;
 [A]US2011077635  (BONN KENLYN S [US]) [A] 1-20 * , all documents, all figs. (Family: none) *;
 [A]US2012053513  (TADA YUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * , all documents, all figs. & JP 2012-45358 A & WO 2012/026336 A1 & EP 2609940 A1 & CN 103068411 A *;
 [A]US6379349  (MUELLER GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * , all documents, all figs. & WO 1997/017009 A2 & DE 19541566 A1 *;
 [A]WO2007024878  (MICRABLATE LLC [US]) [A] 1-20 * , all documents, all figs. & JP 2007-535369 A & US 2006/0276780 A1 *