Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3182948

EP3182948 - AN APPLIANCE FOR USE IN SUPPORTING A WOMAN DURING THE FIRST STAGE OF LABOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.02.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lamberton, Marie Colette
Suite 4, Level 3, 20 George Street
Hornsby, New South Wales 2077 / AU
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Myint, Julie Marie
Symbiosis IP Limited
Cardiff MediCentre
Heath Park
Cardiff CF14 4UJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/26]Fyles, Julie Marie
Symbiosis IP Limited
Basepoint Business Centre
Vale Business Park
Crab Apple Way, Evesham
Worcestershire WR11 1GP / GB
Application number, filing date15834531.412.08.2015
[2017/26]
WO2015AU50458
Priority number, dateAU2014090320618.08.2014         Original published format: AU 2014903206
[2017/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016025993
Date:25.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3182948
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU25.02.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61G5/00, A61G15/04, A47C1/00
[2017/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINER FRAU WÄHREND DES ERSTEN STADIUMS DER WEHEN[2017/26]
English:AN APPLIANCE FOR USE IN SUPPORTING A WOMAN DURING THE FIRST STAGE OF LABOUR[2017/26]
French:APPAREIL DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ EN TANT QUE SUPPORT POUR UNE FEMME DURANT LE PREMIER STADE DU TRAVAIL[2017/26]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2017National basic fee paid 
16.02.2017Search fee paid 
16.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
16.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/26]
16.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]BE1003946  (VOGHEL OLIVIER DE) [X] 1-3,6 * page 4, line 29 - page 6, line 11; figures 1-2 * [I] 4,5,7,8;
 [X]DE8700016U  (BARANOWSKI) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 7, line 13 - page 5, line 24; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB357321  (THOMAS SMITH) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
International search[X]CN202568740U  (LIU ZHENHONG) [X] 1-8 * paragraph 0022, figure 1 *;
 [A]US7445291  (PARKEL et al.) [A] 1 * Abstract and figures *;
 [A]US4529247  (STUMPF et al.) [A] 5 * Abstract and figures *;
 [A]WO9409740  (JOHNSON WAYNE DAVID) [A] 0 * Abstract and figures *;
 [A]CN202086692U  (HUI LIU) [A] 0 * Whole document *;
 [A]US6520578  (JOSPA et al.) [A] 0 * Abstract and figures *