Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3134763

EP3134763 - COMPACT ARCHITECTURE FOR NEAR-TO-EYE DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/36]
Former [2017/45]For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Former [2017/09]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GUPTA, Anurag
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
02 / LUTTMANN, Amber M.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
 [2017/09]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Kurfürstendamm 54-55
10707 Berlin / DE
[2019/36]
Former [2017/09]Derry, Paul Stefan , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date15834983.724.07.2015
[2017/09]
WO2015US42115
Priority number, dateUS20141447357829.08.2014         Original published format: US201414473578
[2017/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016032653
Date:03.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3134763
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016
[2017/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3134763
Date:04.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR03.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/01, // G02B27/00
[2019/13]
Former International [2017/09]G02B27/01
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMPAKTE ARCHITEKTUR FÜR AUGENNAHE ANZEIGESYSTEME[2017/09]
English:COMPACT ARCHITECTURE FOR NEAR-TO-EYE DISPLAY SYSTEM[2017/09]
French:ARCHITECTURE COMPACTE POUR SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE PROCHE DE L' IL[2017/09]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2016National basic fee paid 
23.11.2016Search fee paid 
23.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/09]
23.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2019Fee for grant paid
12.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLT04.09.2019
NO04.12.2019
[2020/08]
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2014153103  (GUPTA ANURAG [US]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figures 2A-2C * * figures 4A-4C * [Y] 1;
 [A]US2013242405  (GUPTA ANURAG [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2A-2C *;
 [Y]US5886822  (SPITZER MARK B [US]) [Y] 1 * figures 3,7,8,9,16,17 *
International search[A]US2013033756  (SPITZER MARK B [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0018], [0021]-[0033], [0044], claim 1 and figure 2. *;
 [A]JP2012063638  (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0032], claim 1 and figures 1-4. *;
 [A]KR20130136394  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0088], [0137], claim 1 and figures 1, 4-5. *;
 [A]US2010066926  (TANIJIRI YASUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0093]-[0095], [0115]-[0119] and figures 8, 11. *;
 [A]US2007217017  (ICHIKAWA TSUTOMU [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0053] and figures 1(a)-2. *