Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3187752 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3187752



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1351
29.05.2024 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
29.05.2024 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 17
29.05.2024 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 17
21.05.2024 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
16.05.2024 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 13
30.04.2024 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 15
30.04.2024 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.04.2024 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.04.2024 Amended description with annotations Appeal 12
11.04.2024 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
11.04.2024 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 4
26.03.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.03.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.03.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.03.2024 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
14.03.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.03.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.03.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.03.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.03.2024 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.03.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.03.2024 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.03.2024 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 2
27.02.2024 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
27.02.2024 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
31.01.2024 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
31.01.2024 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
26.01.2024 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.01.2024 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
01.03.2023 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
24.11.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.11.2022 Claims Appeal 2
16.11.2022 Claims Appeal 2
16.11.2022 Claims Appeal 2
16.11.2022 Claims Appeal 2
16.11.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.11.2022 Reply to appeal Appeal 13
06.07.2022 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.06.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.06.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
21.06.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.06.2022 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 30
17.05.2022 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
05.05.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.05.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.05.2022 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
17.03.2022 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.03.2022 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.03.2022 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
11.03.2022 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
11.03.2022 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
11.03.2022 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.03.2022 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 24
11.03.2022 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.03.2022 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.03.2022 Means of redress Opposition 2
11.03.2022 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
11.03.2022 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
11.03.2022 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
11.03.2022 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.03.2022 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.03.2022 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.03.2022 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 53
11.03.2022 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 53
01.02.2022 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 15
16.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.12.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 022 Opposition 3
16.12.2021 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 2
16.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.12.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 14
07.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
02.12.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.12.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.11.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.11.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.11.2021 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 25
16.11.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 2
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 2
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 2
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 2
16.11.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.11.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
13.07.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2021 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 18
08.07.2021 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.07.2021 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.07.2021 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.07.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 24
08.07.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 24
02.02.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
28.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.01.2021 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
02.11.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 32
26.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.10.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.10.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.10.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 2
26.10.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 2
26.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 019 Opposition 3
26.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 020 Opposition 5
26.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 021 Opposition 1
26.10.2020 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
26.10.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.10.2020 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
14.10.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
09.10.2020 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
28.09.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.09.2020 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 3
28.09.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.09.2020 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Opposition 1
17.06.2020 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.06.2020 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
05.06.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 71
29.05.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 19
29.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 10
29.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 11
29.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 22
29.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 8
29.05.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
29.05.2020 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.05.2020 Request for documents Opposition 1
14.05.2020 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 30
08.05.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 14
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 15
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 11
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 10
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 21
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 9
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 2
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 12
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 18
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 36
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 7
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 12
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 3
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 014 Opposition 32
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 015 Opposition 8
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 016 Opposition 12
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 017 Opposition 40
08.05.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 018 Opposition 25
08.05.2020 International publication (Pamphlet) Opposition 13
08.05.2020 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
08.05.2020 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
26.08.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
02.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.07.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.07.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
02.07.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.05.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.05.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.05.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.05.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 17
14.05.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 17
09.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
09.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.01.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
09.01.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
09.01.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
09.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.01.2018 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
16.08.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
28.07.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.07.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 5
28.07.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
28.07.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
18.07.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
08.06.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
31.03.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.03.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.03.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
10.03.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 15
10.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
10.03.2017 Description Search / examination 15
10.03.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.03.2017 Translation of the annexes to the International Preliminary Examination Report Search / examination 23
07.03.2017 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 24
07.03.2017 Translation of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
09.01.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.03.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
10.03.2016 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
03.03.2016 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
03.03.2016 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 13