Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3188542

EP3188542 - METHODS FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION MAIN CARRIER SWITCH AND CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/27]METHOD, DEVICE, BASE STATION AND UE FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION MAIN CARRIER SWITCH AND CONTROL
[2019/46]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
China Academy of Telecommunications Technology
No. 40 Xue Yuan Road Hai Dian District
Beijing 100191 / CN
[2017/27]
Inventor(s)01 / XU, Fangli
No.40 Xueyuan Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100191 / CN
02 / BAO, Wei
No.40 Xueyuan Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100191 / CN
 [2017/27]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2017/27]
Application number, filing date15836247.527.08.2015
[2017/27]
WO2015CN88281
Priority number, dateCN20141043869929.08.2014         Original published format: CN201410438699
[2017/27]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016029864
Date:03.03.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3188542
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN03.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/28, // H04W36/08, H04W36/00
[2017/36]
Former International [2017/27]H04W36/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGSHAUPTTRÄGERSCHALTER UND -STEUERUNG[2019/46]
English:METHODS FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION MAIN CARRIER SWITCH AND CONTROL[2019/46]
French:PROCÉDÉS POUR UNE COMMUTATION ET UNE COMMANDE DE PORTEUSE PRINCIPALE DE TRANSMISSION EN LIAISON MONTANTE[2019/46]
Former [2017/27]VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, BASISSTATION UND BENUTZERGERÄT FÜR UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGSHAUPTTRÄGERSCHALTER UND -STEUERUNG
Former [2017/27]METHOD, DEVICE, BASE STATION AND UE FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION MAIN CARRIER SWITCH AND CONTROL
Former [2017/27]PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF, STATION DE BASE ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR (UE) POUR UNE COMMUTATION ET UNE COMMANDE DE PORTEUSE PRINCIPALE DE TRANSMISSION EN LIAISON MONTANTE
Entry into regional phase29.03.2017Translation filed 
29.03.2017National basic fee paid 
29.03.2017Search fee paid 
29.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/27]
29.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012044812  (HIDDINK GERRIT W [NL], et al) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 2-7,9-18;
 [I]WO2010105254  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 14a, 14b *;
 [I]WO2011059373  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * page 10, line 1 - page 15, line 14 * * figures 5-8 *;
 [I]  - NEW POSTCOM, "Considerations on PCell change without handover", vol. RAN WG2, no. Bratislava, Slovakia; 20121008 - 20121012, (20120928), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-124777_CONSIDERATIONS ON PCELL CHANGE WITHOUT HANDOVER, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ;, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_79bis/Docs/, (20120928), XP050666463 [I] 1-18 * the whole document *
International search[X]CN102349259  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS) [X] 1-11, 15-29, 33-49, 53-56 * description, paragraphs [0062]-[0064], and figure 14 *;
 [A]CN103327553  (BROADCOM CORP) [A] 1-56 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN101834692  (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-56 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011149913  (PARK SOON GI [KR], et al) [A] 1-56 * the whole document *