Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3186159

EP3186159 - HEAT SEALING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/27]PACKAGE AND HEAT SEALING DEVICE
[2019/51]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
[2017/40]
Former [2017/27]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Corporation Service Company
2711 Centerville Road
Suite 400
Wilmington DE 19808 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CROSBY, Jason, R.
1017 Park Street
Cross Plains, WI 53528 / US
02 / DEBNATH, Gautam
1500 Littleton Road
Parsippany, NJ 07054-3884 / US
03 / FAGER, Roger, P.
1017 Park Street
Cross Plains, WI 53528 / US
04 / LAUBMEIER, Peter, R.
1017 Park Streeet
Cross Plains, WI 53528 / US
05 / STOVER, Curtis, Emmanuel
115 Willow Springs Lane
York, PA 17406 / US
 [2017/27]
Representative(s)Chiappinelli, Susan Ann , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/27]Povey, Alexander W.G.
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date15836332.527.08.2015
[2017/27]
WO2015US47098
Priority number, dateUS201462042854P28.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462042854 P
[2017/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016033281
Date:03.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3186159
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016
[2017/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:B65B7/26, B65B51/10, B65D43/16, B29C65/18, // B65D1/36
[2018/15]
Former International [2017/27]B65D53/06, B29C65/02, B29C65/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/27]
TitleGerman:HEISSSIEGELVORRICHTUNG[2019/51]
English:HEAT SEALING DEVICE[2019/51]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SCELLAGE À CHAUD[2019/51]
Former [2017/27]VERPACKUNG UND HEISSSIEGELVORRICHTUNG
Former [2017/27]PACKAGE AND HEAT SEALING DEVICE
Former [2017/27]EMBALLAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE THERMOSOUDAGE
Entry into regional phase03.03.2017National basic fee paid 
03.03.2017Search fee paid 
03.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/27]
03.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2013134495  (KRAFT FOODS GLOBAL BRANDS LLC [US]) [X] 1,9,12 * abstract * * figures 23-28 * * paragraphs [0115] - [0128] * [I] 2-8,10,11,13,14;
 [XI]US5031383  (HUSTAD GERALD O [US]) [X] 9,10 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 5-8 * [I] 11,13;
 [XI]WO2014042025  (CHOKOKU PLAST CORP [JP], et al) [X] 9,14 * abstract * * figures 1-11 * [I] 1;
 [XI]GB2433913  (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [X] 9 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claims 1,7 * [I] 1
International search[XYA]US4277931  (MAHAFFY REID A, et al) [X] 9, 10, 12 * ; abstract, figure 9, column 4, lines 5-18, column 9, lines 7-13, column 7, lines 57-65, claim 1 of Mahaffy * [Y] 11, 13, 14 [A] 1-8;
 [Y]US2008295455  (BELLAMAH STEPHEN [US]) [Y] 11 * ; paragraphs [0020], [0021] *;
 [Y]US4522302  (PAIKOFF MYRON [US]) [Y] 13, 14 * ; figure 1 B, column 4, lines 27-40 *;
 [A]WO2014069732  (BLT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * ; see machine translation; page 18, paragraphs 3, 5, page 19, paragraph 2, figures 2, 4, 5 *;
 [A]US2009007523  (ALIPOUR EHSAN [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * ; figures 2, 16, paragraphs [0060], [0069], [0091] *;
 [A]US3166462  (JOSEF SCHODER EDUARD) [A] 1, 9 * ; claim 1 *