Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3234288

EP3234288 - ANTI-THEFT AND SAFETY MECHANISM FOR BOTTLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 20.02.2019  [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Enneffe S.r.l.
Via Melgara 3
15048 Valenza (AL) / IT
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / NECCHI, Piero
c/o Blucom S.r.l.
Via Aldo Moro 83
Zona Industriale D4 Scalo
15151 Alessandria (AL) / IT
 [2017/47]
Former [2017/43]01 / NECCHI, Piero
c/o Enneffe S.r.l.
Via Melgara 3
15048 Valenza (AL) / IT
Representative(s)Garavelli, Paolo
A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L.
Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale
Via Servais 27
10146 Torino / IT
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15837104.723.11.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015IT00283
Priority number, dateIT2014TO0106418.12.2014         Original published format: IT TO20141064
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016098136
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3234288
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3234288
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:E05B73/00, B65D55/02
[2018/34]
Former International [2017/43]E05B73/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIEBSTAHLSICHERUNGS- UND SICHERHEITSMECHANISMUS FÜR FLASCHEN[2017/43]
English:ANTI-THEFT AND SAFETY MECHANISM FOR BOTTLES[2017/43]
French:MÉCANISME ANTI-VOL ET DE SÉCURITÉ POUR BOUTEILLES[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2017National basic fee paid 
10.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
10.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2018Fee for grant paid
14.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2012152883  (ZHANG NINGSHENG [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-7 *;
 [AD]CN203499390U  (GUANGZHOU VIRGINLAND TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [AD] 1-13 * figures 1-5 *;
 EP2860334  [ ] (VIRGINLAND TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0021]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2004163430  (BELDEN DENNIS D [US]) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-18 *;
 [A]WO2006033124  (NECCHI PIETRO [IT]) [A] 1,13 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 2; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US5602530  (HOLMGREN BERTIL [SE]) [A] 1,13 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 46; figures 1-7 *
by applicantUS2012152883
 CN203499390U