Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3190465

EP3190465 - ELASTIC MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/28]
Inventor(s)01 / ONIKI Yoshihiko
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
1-1
Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2017/28]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/28]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15837637.629.07.2015
[2017/28]
WO2015JP71484
Priority number, dateJP2014017787402.09.2014         Original published format: JP 2014177874
[2017/28]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016035483
Date:10.03.2016
Language:JA
[2016/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3190465
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3190465
Date:23.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/08, G03G15/00
[2017/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELASTISCHES ELEMENT[2017/28]
English:ELASTIC MEMBER[2017/28]
French:ÉLÉMENT ÉLASTIQUE[2017/28]
Entry into regional phase09.03.2017Translation filed 
09.03.2017National basic fee paid 
09.03.2017Search fee paid 
09.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
09.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/28]
09.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.11.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.11.2018Fee for grant paid
01.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.12.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
05.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)24.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
SM23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/49]AL23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/48]DK23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/46]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL23.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2002214895  (INOUE MTP KK, et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH04243277  (CANON KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2301982  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0094] - [0113]; table 1 *
International search[XY]JP2002214895  (INOUE MTP KK, et al) [X] 1-4, 6, 7 * , paragraphs [0008] to [0040]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [Y] 5;
 [Y]JP2001042663  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 5 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0025] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2004021052  (CANON KK) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0067] to [0097]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2014074863  (OKI DATA KK) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0015] to [0036]; fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH0689062  (CANON KK) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0027] to [0164]; fig. 1 to 27 (Family: none) *