Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3188676

EP3188676 - BIOCOMPOSITE ORTHOPEDIC IMPLANT INTRODUCER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ossio Ltd.
42 HaTakhana St.
3052640 Binyamina / IL
[2017/28]
Inventor(s)01 / PREISS-BLOOM, Orahn
4 HaShlosha
30900 Zichron Yaakov / IL
02 / LINDNER, Taly Pnina
39 Hazait St.
PO Box 6371
56905 Savyon(G.Y) / IL
 [2017/28]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[2019/32]
Former [2017/28]Coyle, Philip Aidan
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
Application number, filing date15838477.607.09.2015
[2017/28]
WO2015IL50904
Priority number, dateUS201462047023P07.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462047023 P
[2017/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016035089
Date:10.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3188676
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016
[2017/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3188676
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL10.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/56, A61B17/68, A61F2/02, A61L27/40, A61F2/30, A61B17/16, A61L27/36, A61L27/50, A61L31/06, A61B17/80, A61B17/86, A61B17/00
[2018/14]
Former International [2017/28]A61B17/56, A61B17/68, A61F2/02, A61L27/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINFÜHRERANDORDNUNG FÜR ORTHOPÄDISCHES BIOKOMPOSITIMPLANTAT[2017/28]
English:BIOCOMPOSITE ORTHOPEDIC IMPLANT INTRODUCER ASSEMBLY[2017/28]
French:ENSEMBLE INTRODUCTEUR D'IMPLANT ORTHOPÉDIQUE BIOCOMPOSITE[2017/28]
Entry into regional phase15.12.2016National basic fee paid 
15.12.2016Search fee paid 
15.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/28]
15.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2019Fee for grant paid
27.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2005077039  (OSTEOBIOLOGICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2007185568  (SCHWARTZ HERBERT E [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0081]; figures 20A,B *;
 [Y]US2012265206  (JANG JASON SHIANG CHING [TW], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2007185568  (BIODUCT, LLC) [X] 1-3, 5-17, 20-40, 42, 46-49, 51, 57, 58, 60 * paragraphs [0002], [0069], [0070], [0081]-[0084], [0092]; figures 20B, 21, 27 *;
 [X]EP1716874  (TYCO HEALTHCARE GROUP LP) [X] 1-7, 9-17, 20-24, 27-44, 46-49, 51, 56-58, 60, 61 * Abstract; column 5 lines 5-8; paragraphs [0028]-[0047], [0072]-[0079]; figures 5-14 *;
 [X]EP2292166  (DEPUY PRODUCTS, INC.) [X] 1, 3, 5-17, 20, 25, 38-40, 46, 50, 57-59 * Abstract; paragraphs [0010], [0053]-[0055], [0057]; figures 18-20 *;
 [A]WO2010122019  (VIVOXID OY) [A] 27-34 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013317555  (BENVENUE MEDICAL, INC.) [A] 1-63 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ARTHREX INC., "BioComposite Interference Screws - A Stronger turn in ACL/PCL Reconstruction", Scientific Research and Development, (20100000), URL: http://www,arthrex.com/knee/biocomposite-interference-screws, XP055416379 [A] 1-58 * the whole document *