Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3191881

EP3191881 - MULTIPLE LIGHT PIPE STRUCTURE FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.12.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 29.01.2020 [2020/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
[2019/10]
Former [2017/29]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / FITZPATRICK, Nathan
6729 Long Run Drive
Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US
 [2017/29]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
20, rue Rouget de Lisle
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2020/05]
Former [2017/29]Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Application number, filing date15839742.228.08.2015
[2017/29]
WO2015US47333
Priority number, dateUS201462048408P10.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462048408 P
[2017/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016040003
Date:17.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3191881
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016
[2017/29]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3191881
Date:29.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/00, F21V8/00
[2018/22]
Former International [2017/29]G02B6/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRUKTUR AUS MEHREREN LICHTRÖHREN FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN[2017/29]
English:MULTIPLE LIGHT PIPE STRUCTURE FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICES[2017/29]
French:STRUCTURE À MULTIPLES CONDUCTEURS DE LUMIÈRE POUR DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES[2017/29]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2017National basic fee paid 
31.03.2017Search fee paid 
31.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/29]
31.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2019Fee for grant paid
12.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012026750  (LETOURNEAU FABIEN [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 40]; figures 5,6 *
International search[Y]US2009109700  (YI GEORGE YOUZHI [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [Y]US5938324  (SALMON D MILES E [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US8534892  (LETOURNEAU FABIEN [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]WO2012174266  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US7538285  (PATEL PARIMAL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US5760754  (AMERO JR WILLARD F [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US5268823  (YERGENSON ROBIN P [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US4772769  (SHUMATE WILLIAM G [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *