Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3191034

EP3191034 - INJECTOR APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EyePoint Pharmaceuticals US, Inc.
400 Pleasant Street
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
[2018/50]
Former [2017/29]For all designated states
PSivida US, Inc.
400 Pleasant Street
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NAZZARO, Martin
35 Mallard Road
Quincy, MA 02169 / US
02 / YORK, Josh
3 Chestnut Street
Ipswich, MA 01938 / US
03 / LEBLANC, Ron
174 Dutcher Street
Hopedale, MA 01747 / US
 [2017/29]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2017/29]Coyle, Philip Aidan
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
Application number, filing date15840278.410.09.2015
[2017/29]
WO2015US49389
Priority number, dateUS201462048902P11.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462048902 P
[2017/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016040605
Date:17.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3191034
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016
[2017/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL17.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/007, A61B17/34, A61M5/178, A61M5/31
[2017/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
TitleGerman:INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG[2017/29]
English:INJECTOR APPARATUS[2017/29]
French:APPAREIL D'INJECTEUR[2017/29]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2017National basic fee paid 
03.03.2017Search fee paid 
03.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/29]
03.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010234817  (NAZZARO MARTIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021]; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]US4820267  (HARMAN SHERMAN M [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 1, line 16 - line 28 *;
 [Y]US4994028  (LEONARD ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 3 - column 7; figure -; claim - *
International search[Y]US2010234817  (NAZZARO MARTIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-49 * para.[0008], [0010]-[0012], [0017], [0019], [0021], [0023], [0024], [0028]; fig. 1-3 *;
 [Y]US2012041369  (BECKER BRUCE [US]) [Y] 1-49 * para.[0025], [0027], [0093], [0108], [0109]; fig. 3-5, 11-13 *