blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3196273

EP3196273 - ANTISTATIC AGENT, ANTISTATIC AGENT COMPOSITION, ANTISTATIC RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.05.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.01.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.05.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adeka Corporation
2-35 Higashiogu 7-chome
Arakawa-ku
Tokyo 116-0012 / JP
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAMURA Tatsuhito
c/o ADEKA CORPORATION
2-13 Shirahata 5-chome
Minami-ku
Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP
02 / NOMURA Kazukiyo
c/o ADEKA CORPORATION
2-13 Shirahata 5-chome
Minami-ku
Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP
 [2017/30]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2017/30]
Application number, filing date15841462.305.08.2015
[2017/30]
WO2015JP72193
Priority number, dateJP2014018848217.09.2014         Original published format: JP 2014188482
[2017/30]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016042936
Date:24.03.2016
Language:JA
[2016/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3196273
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3196273
Date:30.06.2021
Language:EN
[2021/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2018
ClassificationIPC:C09K3/16, C08G63/668, C08L67/00, C08L101/00
[2017/30]
CPC:
C08L87/005 (EP); C09K3/16 (KR,US); C08G63/672 (US);
C08G63/668 (EP,KR,US); C08G81/00 (EP,US); C08L101/00 (KR,US);
C08L23/12 (US); C08L23/14 (US); C08L67/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2201/04 (US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L67/00, C08L23/00 (EP);
C08L67/00, C08L25/04 (EP);
C08L67/00, C08L55/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTISTATISCHES MITTEL, ANTISTATISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, ANTISTATISCHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMKÖRPER[2017/30]
English:ANTISTATIC AGENT, ANTISTATIC AGENT COMPOSITION, ANTISTATIC RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED ARTICLE[2017/30]
French:AGENT ANTISTATIQUE, COMPOSITION D'AGENT ANTISTATIQUE, COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ANTISTATIQUE, ET ARTICLE MOULÉ[2017/30]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2017Translation filed 
05.04.2017National basic fee paid 
05.04.2017Search fee paid 
05.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
05.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2021Fee for grant paid
18.05.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.05.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)31.03.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.08.2015
AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CY30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
IT30.06.2021
LT30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
MK30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
IE05.08.2021
LU05.08.2021
FR30.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
GB30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU05.08.2015
AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CY30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
IT30.06.2021
LT30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
IE05.08.2021
LU05.08.2021
FR30.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
GB30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2023/27]HU05.08.2015
AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
IT30.06.2021
LT30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
IE05.08.2021
LU05.08.2021
FR30.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
GB30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2023/19]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
IT30.06.2021
LT30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
IE05.08.2021
LU05.08.2021
FR30.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
GB30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/36]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
IT30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
IE05.08.2021
LU05.08.2021
FR30.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
GB30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/35]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
IE05.08.2021
LU05.08.2021
FR30.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
GB30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/34]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
LU05.08.2021
FR30.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/29]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
LU05.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/26]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
LU05.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/24]AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
LU05.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/21]AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/18]AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/10]AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/09]AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/08]AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
Former [2022/07]AT30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
Former [2021/51]FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
Former [2021/49]FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
Former [2021/47]FI30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
Former [2021/46]FI30.06.2021
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPH10287738  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0064] * * example 2 *[I] 5,9,15
International search[XA]JPH10287738  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-2, 6-12 * , claims 1 to 7; paragraphs [0001], [0022] to [0023], [0028], [0042], [0044], [0048], [0050], [0074]; examples 3 to 5, 7, 9 (Family: none) * [A] 3-5;
 [A]WO2014115745  (ADEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12* , claims 1 to 11 & TW 201441356 A *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.