Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3194030

EP3194030 - SUBSTITUTED PHENYLPYRROLECARBOXAMIDES WITH THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITY IN HIV [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
New York Blood Center, Inc.
310 East 67 Street
New York, NY 10065 / US
For all designated states
THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services
6011 Executive Boulevard
Suite 325
Rockville, Maryland 20852 / US
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / DEBNATH, Asim Kumar
2100 Linwood Avenue Apt.211
Fort Lee, New Jersey 07024 / US
02 / CURRELI, Francesca
6207 Kennedy Boulevard, Apt. 4AN
West New York, NJ 07093 / US
03 / KWONG, Peter D.
40 Covent Drive
Building 40
Room 4508
Bethesda, Maryland 20892 / US
04 / KWON, Young Do
9000 Rockville Pike
Building 40
Room 4607B
Bethesda, Maryland 20892 / US
 [2019/38]
Former [2017/40]01 / DEBNATH, Asim Kumar
2100 Linwood Avenue Apt.211
Fort Lee, New Jersey 07024 / US
02 / CURRELI, Francesca
6207 Kennedy Boulevard, Apt. 4AN
West New York, NJ 07093 / US
03 / KWONG, Peter D.
40 Covent Drive
Building 40
Room 4508
Bethesda, Maryland 20892 / US
04 / KWON, Young Do
9000 Rockville Pike
Building 40
Room 4607B
Bethesda, Maryland 20982 / US
Former [2017/30]01 / DEBNATH, Asim Kumar
2100 Linwood Avenue Apt.211
Fort Lee, New Jersey 07024 / US
02 / CURRELI, Francesca
6425 Broadway Apt. 12D
Bronx, New York 10065 / US
03 / KWONG, Peter D.
40 Covent Drive
Building 40
Room 4508
Bethesda, Maryland 20892 / US
04 / KWON, Young Do
9000 Rockville Pike
Building 40
Room 4607B
Bethesda, Maryland 20982 / US
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[2019/45]
Former [2017/30]Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
One Euston Square
40 Melton Street
London NW1 2FD / GB
Application number, filing date15841780.818.09.2015
[2017/30]
WO2015US51086
Priority number, dateUS201462052974P19.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462052974 P
US201562209268P24.08.2015         Original published format: US 201562209268 P
US201562209619P25.08.2015         Original published format: US 201562209619 P
[2017/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016044808
Date:24.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3194030
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016
[2017/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3194030
Date:06.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:C07D207/30, C07D207/34, C07D277/20, C07D403/12, C07D405/14, C07D417/12, C07D417/14, C07C233/01, C07C25/00, A61K31/40, A61K31/4025, A61P31/18
[2018/10]
Former International [2017/30]A61P31/18, C07D207/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE PHENYLPYRROLECARBOXAMIDE MIT THERAPEUTISCHER AKTIVITÄT BEI HIV[2017/30]
English:SUBSTITUTED PHENYLPYRROLECARBOXAMIDES WITH THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITY IN HIV[2017/30]
French:PHÉNYLPYRROLE-CARBOXAMIDES SUBSTITUÉS PRÉSENTANT UNE ACTIVITÉ THÉRAPEUTIQUE CONTRE LE VIH[2017/30]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2017National basic fee paid 
18.04.2017Search fee paid 
18.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
18.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.08.2019Fee for grant paid
13.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.09.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
18.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201703   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[XPI]  - FRANCESCA CURRELI ET AL, "Structure-Based Design of a Small Molecule CD4-Antagonist with Broad Spectrum Anti-HIV-1 Activity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20150910), vol. 58, no. 17, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b00709, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 6909 - 6927, XP055443358 [XP] 1,2 * NBD-11021 * [I] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b00709
International search[Y]WO2013036676  (NEW YORK BLOOD CT INC [US], et al) [Y] 1, 30, 37 * para [0016], [0022], [0188], pg 47, compound listed in row 6, col 2; claim 11 *;
 [Y]US2011144103  (CHIMMANAMADA DINESH U [US], et al) [Y] 1, 30, 37 * para [0058]-[0059], [0064]-[0065], [0202], pg 28-31, Table 1 *;
 [A]US2003207913  (PIOTROWSKI DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1, 30, 37 * Entire Document *;
 [A]  - "ZINC37902496", PUBCHEM, (20121019), Database accession no. 60964721, URL: NCBI [A] 1, 30, 37 * pg 3, Fig *
 [A]  - CARA et al., "Phenylpyrrole derivatives as neural and inducible nitric oxide synthase (nNOS and iNOS) inhibitors", European Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (20090000), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 2655 - 2666, XP026049368 [A] 1, 30, 37 * . pg 2658, Scheme 1; Table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2008.11.013
 [A]  - "SCHEMBL14773247", PubChem, (20130610), Database accession no. 71510812, URL: NCBI [A] 1, 30, 37 * pg 3, Fig *
Examination   - Francesca Curreli ET AL, "Structure-Based Design of a Small Molecule CD4-Antagonist with Broad Spectrum Anti-HIV-1 Activity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20150910), vol. 58, no. 17, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b00709, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 6909 - 6927, XP055443358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b00709