Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3193587

EP3193587 - QUANTIFICATION AND INVENTORY MANAGEMENT OF EXPRESSED HUMAN BREAST MILK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Naya Health, Inc.
390 Bridge Parkway
Suite C
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / ALVAREZ, Jeffery, B.
412 Lanyard Drive
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
02 / ALVAREZ, Janica, B.
412 Lanyard Drive
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
03 / GASKIN, Nathaniel
701 East Charleston Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
04 / SEGALOVA, Polina, A.
825 Fulton Street
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
 [2017/30]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2017/30]
Application number, filing date15842872.218.09.2015
[2017/30]
WO2015US51078
Priority number, dateUS201462052941P19.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462052941 P
[2017/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016044802
Date:24.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3193587
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A01J5/007, A01J5/01, A23C9/152
[2017/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
TitleGerman:QUANTIFIZIERUNG UND BESTANDSVERWALTUNG VON EXPRIMIERTER MENSCHLICHER MUTTERMILCH[2017/30]
English:QUANTIFICATION AND INVENTORY MANAGEMENT OF EXPRESSED HUMAN BREAST MILK[2017/30]
French:QUANTIFICATION ET GESTION DE RÉSERVES DE LAIT MATERNEL HUMAIN TIRÉ[2017/30]
Entry into regional phase11.04.2017National basic fee paid 
11.04.2017Search fee paid 
11.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
11.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/19]
12.12.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2019/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201703   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2017
30.09.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2014058430  (TOMY INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [X] 1,4,5,7-9,12,14,15 * page 5, paragraph 24 * * page 6, paragraph 28 - page 7, paragraph 30 * * page 9, paragraph 36 - page 10, paragraph 37 * * figures 1,6,11 * [I] 10,11;
 [XI]US2014263611  (BAUER RYAN [US]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * page 2, paragraph 19 - paragraph 24 * * page 2, paragraph 27 - page 3, paragraph 29 * * page 3, paragraph 31 - paragraph 33 * * page 4, paragraph 40 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 11;
 [XAI]US2010016789  (BOSSHARD PATRIK [CH], et al) [X] 12,15 * page 2, paragraph 29 * * page 3, paragraph 48 * * page 3, paragraph 52 - paragraph 53 * * figures 5,6 * [A] 1-11 [I] 13,14;
 [E]WO2016014494  (EXPLORAMED NC7 LLC [US]) [E] 1-3,5,8-10 * page 44, paragraph 241 - page 45, paragraph 241 * * page 47, paragraph 244 - page 49, paragraph 248 * * page 54, paragraph 259 - page 58, paragraph 268 * * page 61, paragraph 275 * * page 68, paragraph 290 * * page 78, paragraph 298 * * figures 1,4,20,21A,21B,34,37 *
International search[XY]US2014263611  (BAUER RYAN [US]) [X] 1, 12, 14/12, 25-26, 27/25-26, 36-37, 38/36-37 * ; figures 1-5; paragraph [0006], [0019]-[0024], [0027]-[0036], [0040] * [Y] 2, 3/1-2, 13, 14/13;
 [Y]US6383163  (KELLY PATRICIA ANN [US], et al) [Y] 2, 3/1-2, 13, 14/13 * ; column 2, lines 46-49; column 3, lines 32-34 *