Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3197324

EP3197324 - CHANNEL GLIDE ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.07.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lilja, Eva
1 Monster Way
Corona, CA 92879 / US
For all designated states
Lake, Brendan, Hingston
G/F 50 Po Hing Fong Sheung Wan
Hong Kong / CN
[2017/31]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/31]
Representative(s)Raynor, Simon Mark
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/31]Raynor, Simon Mark
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB
Application number, filing date15844783.925.09.2015
[2017/31]
WO2015US52476
Priority number, dateUS201462056390P26.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462056390 P
US201462083443P24.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462083443 P
[2017/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016049587
Date:31.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3197324
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016
[2017/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A47F1/12, A47F5/00, // G09F3/20
[2018/22]
Former International [2018/11]A47F1/12, A47F5/00
Former International [2017/31]A47F1/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/31]
TitleGerman:KANALGLEITANORDNUNGEN[2017/31]
English:CHANNEL GLIDE ASSEMBLIES[2017/31]
French:ENSEMBLES DE GLISSEMENT AVEC RAINURE[2017/31]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2017National basic fee paid 
31.03.2017Search fee paid 
31.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/31]
31.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2011094980  (COUSIN SERGE L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * paragraphs [0058] , [0077]; figures 1,4,9,14,33 * [Y] 11-15 [I] 6,7;
 [XYI]US5788090  (KAJIWARA KIYOHARU [JP]) [X] 1,8,9 * column 7, lines 47-60; figure 7 * [Y] 11-15 [I] 6,7;
 [XYI]US6142316  (HARBOUR KEITH [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10 * column 11, lines 42-46; figures 1,213 * [Y] 11-15 [I] 7;
 [Y]US2006207950  (KIEHNAU BRENDA [US], et al) [Y] 11-15 * paragraph [0039]; figure 6A *;
 [A]US2984031  (GIESECKE ALBERT S) [A] 14,15 * figure 1 *
International search[XY]US7083054  (SQUITIERI ANTHONY C [US]) [X] 1-3, 5-9 * entire document * [Y] 4, 10;
 [Y]US2011094980  (COUSIN SERGE L [US], et al) [Y] 4 * entire document *;
 [Y]US5050748  (TAUB RONALD [US]) [Y] 10 * entire document *;
 [A]US2004020877  (BORON ANDREW J [US]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *;
 [A]US6142316  (HARBOUR KEITH [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *;
 [A]US5645176  (JAY RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *
by applicantUS2011009498