Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3201782

EP3201782 - PROTECTED INDEXING AND QUERYING OF LARGE SETS OF TEXTUAL DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.05.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Terbium Labs, Inc.
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21230 / US
[2019/15]
Former [2017/32]For all designated states
Terbium Labs LLC
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, MD 21230 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROGERS, Daniel
c/o Terbium Labs
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21230 / US
02 / MOORE, Michael
c/o Terbium Labs
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21230 / US
03 / BLAZAKIS, Dionysus
c/o Terbium Labs
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21230 / US
 [2017/32]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/32]
Application number, filing date15846840.523.09.2015
[2017/32]
WO2015US51681
Priority number, dateUS201462058759P02.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462058759 P
US201562110644P02.02.2015         Original published format: US 201562110644 P
US20151464288610.03.2015         Original published format: US201514642886
[2017/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016053714
Date:07.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3201782
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.04.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/00
[2017/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
TitleGerman:GESCHÜTZTE INDEXIERUNG UND ABFRAGE VON GROSSEN MENGEN AN TEXTDATEN[2017/32]
English:PROTECTED INDEXING AND QUERYING OF LARGE SETS OF TEXTUAL DATA[2017/32]
French:INDEXATION ET INTERROGATION PROTÉGÉES DE GRANDS ENSEMBLES DE DONNÉES TEXTUELLES[2017/32]
Entry into regional phase04.04.2017National basic fee paid 
04.04.2017Search fee paid 
04.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/32]
04.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2407900  (GOOGLE INC [US]) [I] 1,2,7-11 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0071] * * figure 5 * * paragraph [0031] *;
 [A]US2010169329  (FRIEDER OPHIR [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0094] *
International search[A]US8838657  (MALONE JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 and 9-11 * , entire document, especially Abstract; col 2, ln 35 to col 3, ln 20; col 5, ln 30-65; col 6, ln 15-60; col 7, ln 60 to col 8, ln 25 *;
 [A]US7098815  (SAMUELS ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-6 and 9-11 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Fig. 2A and 2B; col 1, ln 40-60; col 3, ln 30-44 *;
 [A]US8527516  (SPASOJEVIC NEMANJA L [US], et al) [A] 1-6 and 9-11 * , entire document, especially Abstract; col 4, ln 33-51 *;
 [A]US2007162445  (SCRIFFIGNANO ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1-6 and 9-11 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Para [0027], [0067]-[0068], [0079]-[0081] *;
 [A]US2008201320  (HONG LICHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-6 and 9-11 * , *;
 [A]US8756382  (CARLSON MARCUS A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 and 9-11 * , *