blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3201782 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3201782



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 239
06.05.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 10
06.05.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.04.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
07.03.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 22
26.02.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
26.02.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 4
26.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
18.02.2019 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
08.02.2019 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.10.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
04.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
04.10.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
04.10.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
04.10.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
04.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 11
08.03.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
23.02.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
12.07.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.04.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
04.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.04.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
10.02.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.04.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
28.04.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 51
28.04.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
07.04.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.04.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 32