blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3201782


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.05.2019 First examination report
01.05.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.03.2019 Change - applicant published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.10.2018 Amendment by applicant
14.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.03.2018 Supplementary search report published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
09.03.2018 Change - classification published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
08.12.2017 Change: Validation states published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
08.12.2017 Change - extension states published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
15.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.07.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
07.07.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
07.07.2017 Request for examination filed published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
15.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
28.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
07.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
04.04.2017 Change - representative
04.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
12.04.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2016 PCT data prior to European publication