Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3200944

EP3200944 - ROUND TOOTH CUTTERS AND METHOD OF DESIGN AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eip Holdings LLC
1402 E. Sharon Avenue
Suite 1001
Houghton, Michigan 49931 / US
[2017/32]
Inventor(s)01 / ENDRES, William J.
509 W. Douglass Ave.
Houghton, Michigan 49931 / US
02 / WOODRUFF, Douglas J.
16254 Obenhoff Rd.
Atlantic Mine, Michigan 49905 / US
03 / KROLL, Ryan R.
21485 ArcadianHill Rd.
Hancock, Michigan 49930 / US
 [2017/32]
Representative(s)Sach, Greg Robert
Sach & Associates
Siedlungsstrasse 4a
85253 Erdweg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/32]GPI & Associés
EuroParc de Pichaury
Bâtiment B2 - 1er Etage
1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière
13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR
Application number, filing date15847168.030.09.2015
[2017/32]
WO2015US53130
Priority number, dateUS20141450203530.09.2014         Original published format: US201414502035
[2017/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016054154
Date:07.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3200944
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.04.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:B23B27/16, B23C5/06, B23C5/20
[2017/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
TitleGerman:RUNDE ZAHNSCHNEIDMESSER UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTWURF UND VERWENDUNG[2017/32]
English:ROUND TOOTH CUTTERS AND METHOD OF DESIGN AND USE[2017/32]
French:DISPOSITIFS DE COUPE À DENTS RONDES ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONCEPTION ET D'UTILISATION[2017/32]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2017National basic fee paid 
27.04.2017Search fee paid 
27.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/32]
27.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201703   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2018
30.09.201804   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2885766  (HANS ERNST ET AL) [X] 1-3,7-9,12,13,15 * figure - * * column 2, line 26 - line 51 * * column 2, line 69 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 2 * [Y] 4-6,10,11,14;
 [Y]US4093392  (HOPKINS DAVID ALAN) [Y] 4-6 * abstract * * figure - * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 9 *;
 [Y]US4812087  (STASHKO DANIEL R [US]) [Y] 10,14 * abstract * * figure - * * column 7 *;
 [Y]US2011135407  (KOGA KENICHIROU [JP]) [Y] 11 * abstract * * figure 8 *
International search[XY]US4093392  (HOPKINS, D) [X] 1, 8-12, 15-17, 19-22 * ; figures 1, 8, 11-12; column 1; lines 14-16, 23-26; column 2, lines 16-21, 37-42, 63-66; column 3, lines 8-27; column 4, lines 10-11, 23-24, 47-58, 63-66; column 5, lines 10-16 * [Y] 3-7, 13-14, 18;
 [X]US4552491  (PARKER, F) [X] 1-2 * ; figures 1-5; column 3; lines 31-38, 66-68 *;
 [Y]US6053669  (LAGERBERG, S) [Y] 3-7, 18 * ; figures 1-3; column 1, lines 18-31, 61-66; column 4, lines 1-3; column 5, lines 53-57; column 6, lines 14-17 *;
 [Y]US5074720  (LOQVIST, K et al.) [Y] 13 * ; figure 1; column 1, lines 41-46; column 3, lines 53-60; column 6, lines 14-17 *;
 [Y]US2011135407  (KOGA, K) [Y] 13-14 * ; figure 1; paragraphs [0005], [0023], [0037] *;
 [X]US4812087  (STASHKO, D) [X] 1, 8-9, 12, 16-17, 20-22 * ; figures 1, 3-4, 5, 9,12a; column 1, lines 59-65; column 3, lines 47-54; column 4, lines 53-59; column 5, lines 8-9, 34-36, 61-68; column 6, lines 1-29 *;
 [A]US2645003  (THOMPSON, A et al.) [A] 1-22 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US2013183107  (TDY INDUSTRIES, LLC) [A] 1-22 * ; entire document *