Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3200944 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3200944



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 274
12.02.2019 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 4
12.02.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.02.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
06.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
06.02.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
06.02.2019 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
06.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.02.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
31.07.2018 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
13.07.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.07.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 7
13.07.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
13.07.2018 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
02.07.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
06.11.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
12.07.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.04.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.04.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 36
27.04.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.04.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
10.02.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.04.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 91
07.04.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 80