Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3200944


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.10.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.03.2019 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
28.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.03.2019 Amendment by applicant
08.02.2019 Change - representative
06.11.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
14.07.2018 Supplementary search report published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
13.07.2018 Change - classification published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
13.07.2018 Change - classification published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
29.03.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
29.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.12.2017 Change: Validation states published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
01.12.2017 Change - extension states published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
07.11.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
07.07.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
07.07.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
07.07.2017 Request for examination filed published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
15.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
28.04.2017 Change - representative
28.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
28.04.2017 Amendment by applicant
15.04.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2016 PCT data prior to European publication