blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3204334

EP3204334 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OXIDATION OF AMMONIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.2020New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xogen Technologies Inc.
20 Robb Boulevard
Orangeville, Ontario L9W 3L2 / CA
[2017/33]
Inventor(s)01 / BEJAN, Dorin
275 Royalton Common
Suite 49
Oakville, ON L6H 0N2 / CA
02 / GAGNON, Craig
4527 Weltham Way
Beamsville, Ontario L0R 1B6 / CA
 [2018/37]
Former [2017/43]01 / BEJAN, Dorin
275 Royalton Common
Suite 49
Oakville, ON L6H 0N2 / CA
02 / GAGNON, Craig
787 Asleton Boulevard
Milton, Ontario L9T 8K3 / CA
Former [2017/33]01 / BEJAN, Dorin
3348 Roma Avenue
Burlington, Ontario L7M 0N7 / CA
02 / GAGNON, Craig
787 Asleton Boulevard
Milton, Ontario L9T 8K3 / CA
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
Carnegieplein 5
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/33]
Application number, filing date15848194.509.10.2015
[2017/33]
WO2015CA51030
Priority number, dateUS201462062369P10.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462062369 P
[2017/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016054749
Date:14.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3204334
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2017/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA14.04.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:C02F1/46, C02F1/76, C02F1/50, // C02F101/16
[2018/13]
CPC:
C02F1/4674 (EP,KR,US); C02F1/008 (KR,US); C02F2101/16 (EP,KR,US);
C02F2201/46135 (EP,KR,US); C02F2201/4614 (EP,KR,US); C02F2201/46145 (EP,KR,US);
C02F2209/001 (EP,US); C02F2209/003 (KR,US); C02F2209/005 (EP,KR,US);
C02F2209/14 (EP,KR,US); C02F2209/29 (EP,KR,US); C02F2209/40 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/33]C02F1/46, C02F1/76, C02F1/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/33]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AMMONIAKOXIDATION[2017/33]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OXIDATION OF AMMONIA[2017/33]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'OXYDATION D'AMMONIAC[2017/33]
Entry into regional phase10.05.2017National basic fee paid 
10.05.2017Search fee paid 
10.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/33]
10.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/04]
Appeal following examination13.05.2019Appeal received No.  J0006/19
13.05.2019Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
17.01.2020Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201804   M06   Not yet paid
31.10.201905   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2004160349  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD, et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0030] - [0032]; figures 1-7 *;
 [I]JP2004202484  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0013] - [0024] , [0028] , [0042] - [0045] - [0047]; figure 6 *;
 [A]US2006131168  (SHELP GENE S [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0044] - [0072] - [0074]; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO2013176032  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND ENVIRONMENTAL & CHEMICAL ENG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0042]; figures 1-2 *
International search[X]CA2225261  (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-20*whole document *;
 [X]US2006163173  (SUZUKI HARUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 *whole document *;
 [X]WO2008062970  (JEON CHI JUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-20 *whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.