EP3205172 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING DUPLICATED E-RABS FOR DUAL CONNECTIVITY IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Jian IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
BYUN, Daewook IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15848273.7 | 02.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015KR10451 | Priority number, date | US201462061676P | 08.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462061676 P | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016056794 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205172 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/34, // H04L5/00, H04W76/11 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
H04W76/34 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W76/11 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0098 (US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04L5/0091 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | H04W76/02, H04W76/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG VON DUPLIZIERTEN E-RABS ZUR DUALEN KONNEKTIVITÄT IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2017/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING DUPLICATED E-RABS FOR DUAL CONNECTIVITY IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2017/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE TRAITER DES E-RAB DUPLIQUÉS POUR UNE CONNECTIVITÉ DOUBLE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 21.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 07.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY] - LG ELECTRONICS INC., "Consideration on open issues for Path Switch", R3-142390, 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 Meeting #85bis, (20140927), XP050870940 [X] 1, 4, 7-12, 15 * See pages 2-4. * [Y] 2, 3, 5, 6, 13, 14 | [Y] - LG ELECTRONICS INC., "Discussion on Path Switch Failure", R3-141844, 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 Meeting #85, (20140809), XP050821968 [Y] 2, 3, 13, 14 * See page 2. * | [Y] - LG ELECTRONICS INC., "Stage 2 TP for Path Switch", R3-142391, 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 Meeting #85bis, (20140927), XP050870941 [Y] 5 * See page 2. * | [Y] - LG ELECTRONICS INC., "Stage 3 TP for Path Switch", R3-142392, 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 Meeting #85bis, (20140927), XP050870942 [Y] 6 * See page 5. * | [A] - HUAWEI, "Discussion on E-RAB Modification Indication procedure", R3-141610, 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 Meeting #85, (20140808), XP050821711 [A] 1-15 * See pages 1-3. * |