blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3209959

EP3209959 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2017/35]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Hyungki
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / HEO, Junyi
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / LEE, Jihyun
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2017/35]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/35]
Application number, filing date15851833.221.10.2015
[2017/35]
WO2015KR11126
Priority number, dateKR2014014315922.10.2014         Original published format: KR 20140143159
[2017/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016064182
Date:28.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3209959
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2017/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3209959
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR28.04.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2018
ClassificationIPC:F25D23/04, F25D25/02, A47B88/403, F25D23/02
[2018/25]
CPC:
F25D25/025 (EP,CN,KR,US); F25D23/02 (KR); F25D23/025 (EP,CN,US);
A47B88/477 (US); F25D23/04 (EP,CN,US); F25D25/00 (KR);
F25D25/022 (KR); A47B2210/175 (EP,US); F25D2323/023 (US);
F25D2323/024 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/35]F25D23/02, F25D25/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÜHLSCHRANK[2017/35]
English:REFRIGERATOR[2017/35]
French:RÉFRIGÉRATEUR[2017/35]
Entry into regional phase23.03.2017National basic fee paid 
23.03.2017Search fee paid 
23.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/35]
16.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2019Fee for grant paid
14.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19172902.9  / EP3564605
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.10.2015
AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
MK26.06.2019
MT26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
GB21.10.2019
IE21.10.2019
LU21.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
[2022/32]
Former [2021/34]HU21.10.2015
AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
MT26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
GB21.10.2019
IE21.10.2019
LU21.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2021/33]HU21.10.2015
AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
GB21.10.2019
IE21.10.2019
LU21.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2021/26]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
GB21.10.2019
IE21.10.2019
LU21.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2020/48]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
GB21.10.2019
IE21.10.2019
LU21.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2020/46]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IE21.10.2019
LU21.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2020/37]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
LU21.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2020/36]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
LU21.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2020/35]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
LU21.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/34]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/29]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/22]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/17]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/13]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/12]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/11]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/09]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2020/07]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008168794  (CHO YOUNG JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [I]KR101264931B  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]KR20140105687  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16* figures 1-12 *;
 [E]US2017082351  (JUNG YONGKI [KR]) [E] 1-16 * abstract *
International search[A]KR20090132398  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0032] and figures 1-4. *;
 [A]US2011016908  (KIM YOUNG-NAM [KR]) [A] 1-16* See paragraphs [0043]-[0089] and figures 1-10. *;
 [A]US2011023528  (KWON HONG SIK [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0062] and figures 1-10. *;
 [A]KR20110080021  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See paragraph [0048] and figure 3. *;
 [A]KR20140105687  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0040], [0057] and figures 4-6. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.