Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3209486

EP3209486 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL INKJET PRINTING USING RING-OPENING METATHESIS POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.02.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stratasys Ltd.
1 Holtzman Street
Science Park
P.O. Box 2496
7612401 Rehovot / IL
[2017/35]
Inventor(s)01 / VIDAVSKY, Yuval
306 Inbar Street
7683400 Moshav Sitriya / IL
02 / YUDOVIN-FARBER, Ira
1/9 Neve Alon Street
7645501 Rehovot / IL
 [2017/35]
Representative(s)Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
[2017/35]
Application number, filing date15852577.421.10.2015
[2017/35]
WO2015IL51038
Priority number, dateUS201462066398P21.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462066398 P
US201462066402P21.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462066402 P
[2017/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016063282
Date:28.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3209486
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016
[2017/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL28.04.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:B29C67/00, C08G61/06
[2018/30]
Former International [2017/35]B29C67/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/35]
TitleGerman:DREIDIMENSIONALES TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKEN MIT RINGÖFFNUNGS-METATHESENPOLYMERISIERUNG[2017/35]
English:THREE-DIMENSIONAL INKJET PRINTING USING RING-OPENING METATHESIS POLYMERIZATION[2017/35]
French:IMPRESSION À JET D'ENCRE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE PAR POLYMÉRISATION PAR OUVERTURE DE CYCLE PAR MÉTATHÈSE[2017/35]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2017National basic fee paid 
22.05.2017Search fee paid 
22.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/35]
17.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2005040564  (OLIVER JONES [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 7, 8, 18 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] *;
 [Y]EP2460587  (TELENE SAS [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 43]; tables 3-5 *
International search[X]US2005040564  (OLIVER JONES [US], et al) [X] 1-68 * abstract, [0006], [0015],[0017] , [0018], [0026], [0030], [0031] *;
 [X]  - VIDAVSKY et al., "Light-induced olefin metathesis.", Beilstein journal of organic chemistry, vol. 6, (20100000), pages 1106 - 1119, (20101123), XP055247798 [X] 1-68 * 1106-1108 , 1111, 1117 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3762/bjoc.6.127