Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3209486 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3209486



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 301
03.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
03.07.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
03.07.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
22.02.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.02.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.02.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.01.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.01.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
10.07.2018 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
21.06.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.06.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 2
21.06.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
21.06.2018 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
06.06.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
02.08.2017 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
02.08.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.07.2017 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
28.06.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.06.2017 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.06.2017 Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data Search / examination 2
30.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.05.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
15.05.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
09.05.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
09.05.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
28.04.2017 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
03.03.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
31.01.2017 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
27.01.2017 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
18.05.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
18.05.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
28.04.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.04.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 133