Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3209486


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.10.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.07.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.02.2019 First examination report
19.02.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.01.2019 Amendment by applicant
30.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.06.2018 Supplementary search report published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
22.06.2018 Change - classification published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
22.06.2018 Change - classification published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
28.12.2017 Change: Validation states published on  24.01.2018  [2018/04]
28.12.2017 Change - extension states published on  24.01.2018  [2018/04]
25.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.07.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
28.07.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
28.07.2017 Request for examination filed published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
05.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
15.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
18.05.2017 Amendment by applicant
15.05.2017 Change - representative
15.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
04.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
29.04.2016 PCT data prior to European publication