Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3217568

EP3217568 - SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS OF APPARATUS HAVING PLURALITY OF ANTENNAS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2017/37]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAE, Hyukjin
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / PARK, Jonghyun
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2017/37]
Representative(s)Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/37]
Application number, filing date15856191.009.11.2015
[2017/37]
WO2015KR12006
Priority number, dateUS201462076499P07.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462076499 P
[2017/37]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016072819
Date:12.05.2016
Language:KO
[2016/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3217568
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.05.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/06, H04B7/04
[2017/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/37]
TitleGerman:SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN ANTENNEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2017/37]
English:SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS OF APPARATUS HAVING PLURALITY OF ANTENNAS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2017/37]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL D'UN APPAREIL À ANTENNES MULTIPLES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2017/37]
Entry into regional phase08.05.2017Translation filed 
08.05.2017National basic fee paid 
08.05.2017Search fee paid 
08.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/37]
08.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2014185699  (ZHANG JIAN [CN], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0043] , [0046] , [0048] , [0051] - [0053] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0063]; tables 1,2 * [Y] 4,11 [I] 2,5-7,9,12-14;
 [I]US2014029695  (LIU JIANGHUA [CN], et al) [I] 1-3,5-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0031] - [0032]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0028] , [0085] - [0088] *;
 [Y]US2008192856  (JONGREN GEORGE [SE], et al) [Y] 4,11 * paragraph [0042] *;
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical Channels and Modulation (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.211, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110330), no. V10.1.0, pages 1 - 103, XP050476528 [A] 1-14 * page 59, paragraph 6.3.4.2.2 *
International search[A]US2013094468  (KO HYUNSOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0056]-[0077], [0103]-[0112], claim 1 and figures 5(a)-5(b), 9. *;
 [A]WO2014129858  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0012], [0073]-[0104], [0118]-[0134], claims 1, 14 and figures 13-14. *;
 [A]US2012213310  (KO HYUN SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0033], [0044]-[0055], claims 10, 17 and figure 2. *;
 [A]  - SAMSUNG, "Need for aggregated CQI across CSI-RS resources", R1-122230, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #69, Prague, Czech Republic, (20120512), XP050600494 [A] 1-14 * See pages 1, 2. *
 [A]  - CATT, "Definitions for Active Antenna Systems (MS", R4-136495, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG4 Meeting #69, San Francisco, USA, (20131104), XP050739431 [A] 1-14 * See pages 1-3. *