Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3219022

EP3219022 - ELEVATION PMI REPORTING ON PUCCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/38]
Inventor(s)01 / WEI, Chao
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / ZHANG, Yu
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/38]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/38]
Application number, filing date15858229.630.09.2015
[2017/38]
WO2015CN91177
Priority number, dateWO2014CN9068010.11.2014         Original published format: PCT/CN2014/090680
[2017/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016074542
Date:19.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3219022
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016
[2017/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.05.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/04
[2017/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/38]
TitleGerman:PMI-BENACHRICHTIGUNG DER HÖHE AUF PUCCH[2017/38]
English:ELEVATION PMI REPORTING ON PUCCH[2017/38]
French:RAPPORT D'INDICE PMI D'ÉLÉVATION SUR CANAL PUCCH[2017/38]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2017National basic fee paid 
28.03.2017Search fee paid 
28.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN
28.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/38]
28.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]CN103634085  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [X] 1,4,11,14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0078] * * figures 1,8 * [I] 2,3,6,9,12,13;
 [P]EP2890023  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH [CN]) [P] * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0054] * * figures 1,8; tables 1,2 *;
 [A]  - 3GPP, "3GPP TS 36.213 V12.2.0", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION GROUP RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; EVOLVED UNIVERSAL TERRESTRIAL RADIO ACCESS (E-UTRA); PHYSICAL LAYER PROCEDURES (RELEASE 12), (20140601), pages 1 - 207, XP055440656 [A] 1-4,6,9,11-15 * tables 7.2.2-3 *
International search[XYA]WO2013144360  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]) [X] 1, 2, 5-16, 22, 23, 26-30 * description, paragraphs [0073], [0089], [0091], [00100], [00101], [00104], [00119], [00125], [00126], figures 2, 10, 11description paragraphs [0073], [0089], [0091], [00100], [00101], [00104], [00119], [00125], [00126] figures 2, 10, 11the whole description * [Y] 3, 4, 18-20, 24, 25 [A] 17, 21;
 [A]US2013329649  (WERNERSSON NIKLAS [SE], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *
 [YA]  - "3GPP TS 36.213 v12.2.0", 3GPP, (20140630) [Y] 3, 4, 18-20, 24, 25 * , section 5.1.2the whole document * [A] 1, 2, 5-17, 21-23, 26-30