EP3220671 - GROUP RESOURCE UPDATE PROCESSING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM, AND CSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Kun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Mozzi, Matteo Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 15859105.7 | 11.05.2015 | [2017/38] | WO2015CN78706 | Priority number, date | CN201410650224 | 14.11.2014 Original published format: CN201410650224 | CN201410660392 | 18.11.2014 Original published format: CN201410660392 | [2017/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016074455 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220671 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/08, H04W4/00, H04L29/08 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/566 (EP,US);
H04L47/2408 (US);
H04L47/803 (US);
H04W4/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON GRUPPENRESSOURCENAKTUALISIERUNGEN SOWIE CSE | [2017/38] | English: | GROUP RESOURCE UPDATE PROCESSING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM, AND CSE | [2017/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE MISE À JOUR DE RESSOURCES DE GROUPE, ET CSE | [2017/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2017 | Translation filed | 19.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 19.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013029716 (LEE JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0048] , [0 51] , [0 52] , [0 84] , [0 91]; figure 2; table 6 *[I] 3,9 | International search | [A]CN101616399 (UNIV BEIJING JIAOTONG) [A] 1-15 * , description, page 2, last line to page 7, line 11 *; | [A]CN103096433 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103188616 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103618800 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *; | [A]WO2014169804 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-15* , the whole document * |