Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3219091

EP3219091 - ESTABLISHING COMMUNICATION BETWEEN MOBILE TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alibaba Group Holding Limited
Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town
Grand Cayman / KY
[2017/38]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Zhiguo
Alibaba Group Legal Department
5/F
Building 3
No. 969 West Wen Yi Road, Yu Hang District
Hangzhou 311121 / CN
 [2017/38]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/38]Patel, Binesh
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham West Midlands
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date15859565.210.11.2015
[2017/38]
WO2015US60013
Priority number, dateCN20141064400810.11.2014         Original published format: CN201410644008
[2017/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016077384
Date:19.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3219091
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016
[2017/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.05.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/436, H04M1/2745, H04M1/57, H04M1/665, H04M19/04, H04W4/16
[2018/24]
Former International [2017/38]H04M3/436
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/38]
TitleGerman:AUFBAU EINER KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN MOBILEN ENDGERÄTEN[2017/38]
English:ESTABLISHING COMMUNICATION BETWEEN MOBILE TERMINALS[2017/38]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉTABLIR UNE COMMUNICATION ENTRE DES TERMINAUX MOBILES[2017/38]
Entry into regional phase08.05.2017National basic fee paid 
08.05.2017Search fee paid 
08.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/38]
08.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP2328334  (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 6,9 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 1-5,11 [I] 7,8,10;
 [Y]US2012144198  (HAR OMER [IL], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0002] *;
 [Y]US2011211572  (CAMPION NICHOLAS F [US], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] *;
 [A]WO2012001016  (SKYPE IRELAND TECHNOLOGIES HOLDINGS LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008101584  (GRAY THOMAS A [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
International search[XY]US2007165821  (ALTBERG EBBE [US], et al) [X] 1, 4-13, 15, 18, 20-23, 31-35, 37 * ; Abstract; paragraphs [0069], [0071], [0270], [0368]. * [Y] 2, 14, 16, 17, 19, 24, 25;
 [YA]US2013195264  (KIRCHHOFF LELAND W [US], et al) [Y] 2, 19 * ; Abstract; paragraphs [0066], [0160], [0420], [0423]. * [A] 3;
 [Y]US2012144198  (HAR OMER [IL], et al) [Y] 14, 16, 17, 24, 25 * ; Abstract; paragraphs [0018], [0019], [0025]. *;
 [Y]US5857022  (SUDIA FRANK WELLS [US]) [Y] 17, 25 * ; Abstract; Column 11, lines 20-21; Coulmn 43, lines 66-67; Column 44, lines 1-2, 26-27. *;
 [A]US2011213974  (ARDON SEBASTIEN [AU], et al) [A] 3 * ; whole document. *;
 [A]US2014310263  (LIU FUDI [CN], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; whole document. *;
 [A]US6324645  (ANDREWS RICHARD F [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * . whole document. *