Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3222941

EP3222941 - AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.07.2019
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2017/39]
Inventor(s)01 / SUZUKI, Yasuhiro
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / KOMAI, Takao
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / MAEDA, Akira
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / KAWASHIMA, Mitsuru
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2017/39]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[2017/39]
Application number, filing date15860849.702.09.2015
[2017/39]
WO2015JP74909
Priority number, dateWO2014JP8048118.11.2014         Original published format: PCT/JP2014/080481
[2017/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016080050
Date:26.05.2016
Language:JA
[2016/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3222941
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.05.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:F25B49/02, F24F11/02, F24F11/00
[2017/44]
Former International [2017/39]F25B49/02, F24F11/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/39]
TitleGerman:KLIMAANLAGE[2017/39]
English:AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE[2017/39]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CLIMATISATION[2017/39]
Entry into regional phase09.11.2016Translation filed 
09.11.2016National basic fee paid 
09.11.2016Search fee paid 
09.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/39]
09.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]JP2014035171  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0090]; fig. 1 to 7 & CN 203672016 U *;
 [Y]JP2014142141  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0003], [0023], [0052] to [0065]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2004116885  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraph [0045] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPH11173684  (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraph [0008] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2010025519  (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0026]; fig. 1 to 3 & WO 2009/098847 A1 & CN 101910738 A *;
 [Y]JPH10103742  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0010]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 5899807 A column 1, line 14 to column 2, line 48; fig. 1 to 2 & IT 97730499 A & ID 18743 A & KR 10-0244330 B1 & CN 1176366 A *;
 [Y]JP2000234797  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0005] to [0042]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2002372317  (TOSHIBA CARRIER KK) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0005]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]US2013180268  (SCHLOSSER CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1-4 * , paragraph [0035] & WO 2013/106725 A1 *