EP3220735 - VERTICAL HYDROPONIC TOWER ARRAY FIXTURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Wyoming 1000 E. University Avenue Laramie, WY 82071 / US | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOREY, Nathaniel R. P.O. Box 6 Laramie, Wyoming 82073 / US | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/39] | Application number, filing date | 15860942.0 | 11.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015US60085 | Priority number, date | US201462081733P | 19.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462081733 P | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016081234 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220735 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3220735 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01G31/02 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
A01G31/02 (EP,US);
A01G18/66 (US);
A01G18/69 (US);
A01G24/15 (EP,US);
A01G24/18 (EP,US);
A01G24/22 (EP,US);
A01G24/30 (EP,US);
A01G24/42 (US);
A01G24/48 (EP,US);
A01G25/00 (US);
A01G27/04 (US);
A01G9/047 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | A01G31/00, A01G31/02, A01G9/04, A01G25/02, A01G31/06 | ||
Former IPC [2017/39] | A01G31/00, A01G31/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTIKALES HYDROPONISCHES TURMENANORDNUNG-BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/02] | English: | VERTICAL HYDROPONIC TOWER ARRAY FIXTURE SYSTEM | [2017/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MONTAGE DE RÉSEAU DE TOURS HYDROPONIQUES VERTICALES | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/39] | VERTIKALES HYDROPONISCHES TURMARRAY-BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 21.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2015 | AL | 22.07.2020 | AT | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | CZ | 22.07.2020 | DK | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | ES | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | IT | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | NL | 22.07.2020 | PL | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | RS | 22.07.2020 | SE | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | TR | 22.07.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | IE | 11.11.2020 | LU | 11.11.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | PT | 23.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.11.2015 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IE | 11.11.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IE | 11.11.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2013067813 (STOREY NATHANIEL R [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-11,13-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-16 *[A] 3,12; | [YA]JP2014212701 (BESCON KK) [Y] 1,2,4-11,13-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,12 | International search | [Y]US3018586 (LANE FARLEY BARBARA) [Y] 13 and 26 * ; figure 2, column 1, lines 35-40, column 2, lines 40-45 *; | [A]JPH0614665 (EMUSHIKI SUIKO KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 3, 16 * ; figure 3 *; | [Y]CA2284389 (BLACK ALLAN [CA]) [Y] 6 and 19 * ; figure 3, page 18, lines 25-30 *; | [Y]US8327582 (STOREY NATHANIEL R [US]) [Y] 1-2, 4-15, 18-23 and 25-27 * ; figure 1, column 3, lines 55-60, column 4, lines 1-10 *; | [Y]US2014259904 (COLLARD WILLIAM CHARLES [US]) [Y] 4 and 11 * ; figure 13, paragraphs [0035], [0061] *; | [Y]JP5615461B (IOROI, Y) [Y] 7-9 and 20-22 * ; figure 1B, page 6, paragraph 3, page 9, paragraph 1, page 10, paragraphs 1-2 *; | [Y]JP2014212701 (BESCON KK) [Y] 1-2, 4-15, 18-23 and 25-27 * ; figures 1, 2, 3, page 1, paragraph 2, page 2, paragraphs 1-2, page 3, paragraphs 1 and 5, page 4, paragraph 1, page 4, paragraphs 1-3, page 5, paragraphs 2 and 6, page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [PX]WO2015175415 (UNIV WYOMING [US]) [PX] 1-27* ; entire document * |