Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3223747

EP3223747 - DETERMINATION OF FERTILITY POTENTIAL FROM THE OXIDATION-REDUCTION POTENTIAL OF A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aytu BioScience, Inc.
373 Inverness Parkway, Suite 206
Englewood, CO 80112 / US
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / BAR-OR, Raphael
1720 Wynkoop Street
Unit 214
Denver, CO 80202 / US
02 / BAR-OR, David
900 E. Oxford Lane
Englewood, CO 80110 / US
03 / RAEL, Leonard T.
5509 S. Lisbon Street
Centennial, CO 80015 / US
04 / BJUGSTAD, Kimberly B.
9212 S. Lost Hill Drive
Lone Tree, CO 80124 / US
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date15862884.224.11.2015
[2017/40]
WO2015US62455
Priority number, dateUS201462084414P25.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462084414 P
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2016085997
Date:02.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3223747
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.07.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/487, G01N27/416, A61B10/00
[2018/25]
Former International [2017/40]A61D19/00, G01N33/92, G01N27/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG DES FRUCHTBARKEITSPOTENZIALS AUS DEM OXIDATIONSREDUKTIONSPOTENZIAL EINER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBE[2017/40]
English:DETERMINATION OF FERTILITY POTENTIAL FROM THE OXIDATION-REDUCTION POTENTIAL OF A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE[2017/40]
French:DÉTERMINATION DE POTENTIEL DE FÉCONDITÉ À PARTIR DU POTENTIEL D'OXYDORÉDUCTION D'UN ÉCHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE[2017/40]
Entry into regional phase25.05.2017National basic fee paid 
25.05.2017Search fee paid 
25.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
25.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2014066533  (LUOXIS DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [Y] 2 * page 15, paragraph l; example - *;
 [IY]  - DE LA CRUZ CARO J ET AL, "POTENCIAL DE OXIDORREDUCCION DEL ESPERMIO EN RELACION CON LA FERTILIDAD - [Oxidation-reduction potential of sperm in relation to fertility]", ARCHIVOS DE MEDICINA EXPERIMENTAL; TRABAJOS DEL INSTITUTO NACIONAL DE CIENCIAS MEDICAS, ES, (1954), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0004-0568, pages 375 - 405, XP009505277 [I] 1 * page 403, lines 17-31 * [Y] 2
 [I]  - H.-Y. LIAN ET AL, "Antioxidant supplementation overcomes the deleterious effects of maternal restraint stress-induced oxidative stress on mouse oocytes", REPRODUCTION, GB, (20130916), vol. 146, no. 6, doi:10.1530/REP-13-0268, ISSN 1470-1626, pages 559 - 568, XP055475080 [I] 4,5 * page 561, column r *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1530/REP-13-0268
 [A]  - LIZHU ZHI ET AL, "The reliability of clinical dynamic monitoring of redox status using a new redox potential (ORP) determination method", REDOX REPORT., GB, (20130719), vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1179/1351000213Y.0000000042, ISSN 1351-0002, pages 63 - 70, XP055473928 [A] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1179/1351000213Y.0000000042
 [A]  - ASHOK AGARWAL ET AL, "Effect of Oxidative Stress on Male Reproduction", THE WORLD JOURNAL OF MEN'S HEALTH, (20140425), vol. 32, no. 1, doi:10.5534/wjmh.2014.32.1.1, ISSN 2287-4208, page 1, XP055473672 [A] 1,2 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5534/wjmh.2014.32.1.1
International search[XY]WO2014066533  (LUOXIS DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [X] 6 * ; page 2, lines 30-33; page 8, lines 15-20; page 15, lines 24-25; page 28, lines 1-5; page 48, lines 30-32; claim 67 * [Y] 1-3, 7;
 [Y]CA2203828  (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US]) [Y] 1-3, 7 * ; abstract; page 3, lines 4-6, 20-25; page 4, lines 10-15; page 8, lines 14-20, 35-40, page 9, lines 1-5, 20-25 *