Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3224726

EP3224726 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEMORY MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alibaba Group Holding Limited
Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town
Grand Cayman / KY
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / NIU, Gongbiao
Alibaba Group Legal Department
5/F Building 3
No. 969 West Wen YI Road
Yu Hang District
Hangzhou 311121 / CN
02 / HUANG, Zheng
Alibaba Group Legal Department
5/F Building 3
No. 969 West Wen YI Road
Yu Hang District
Hangzhou 311121 / CN
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/40]Patel, Binesh
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham West Midlands
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date15863093.925.11.2015
[2017/40]
WO2015US62801
Priority number, dateCN20141068687225.11.2014         Original published format: CN201410686872
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016086203
Date:02.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3224726
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/02, G06F9/50
[2018/30]
Former International [2017/40]G06F12/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPEICHERVERWALTUNG[2017/40]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEMORY MANAGEMENT[2017/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GESTION DE MÉMOIRE[2017/40]
Entry into regional phase24.05.2017National basic fee paid 
24.05.2017Search fee paid 
24.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
24.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
24.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2005257020  (KASHYAP SUJATHA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0011] - [0019] - [0025] - [0 31] - [0051]; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US2005114621  (LAHIRI TIRTHANKAR [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] - [0071]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2013275707  (SCHENFELD EUGEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0039] , [0041] , [0042] , [0045] , [0050] , [0052] , [0054] , [0056] , [0072]; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US2003093628  (MATTER EUGENE P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0 20] - [0021] *
International search[Y]US2005257020  (KASHYAP SUJATHA [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * ; figures 4, 5; paragraphs [0010], [0031], [0032], [0036], [0041]. *;
 [Y]US2013138840  (KEGEL ANDREW [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * ; figure 3; paragraphs [0073], [0093], [0147]. *;
 [Y]US2013275707  (SCHENFELD EUGEN [US], et al) [Y] 4-15, 17-18 * ; figures 2, 3, 4; paragraphs [0049], [0050]. *;
 [Y]US2004243884  (VU PAUL H [US], et al) [Y] 9-10, 14 * ; figure 1; paragraphs [0008], [0021], [0024], [0034]; claim 1. *