Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3224999

EP3224999 - METHOD TO OPTIMIZE FLOW-BASED NETWORK FUNCTION CHAINING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 29.08.2018  [2018/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / ROCH, Evelyne
5 Hanson Street
Gatineau, Québec J8Y 3M2 / CA
02 / BRONSTEIN, Zvika
24 Almog St.
52960 Ramar Efal / IL
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date15863450.118.11.2015
[2017/40]
WO2015CN94935
Priority number, dateUS20141455377225.11.2014         Original published format: US201414553772
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016082708
Date:02.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3224999
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016
[2017/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3224999
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN02.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/751, H04L12/721, H04L12/741, H04L12/801
[2017/42]
Former International [2017/40]H04L12/751, H04L12/721
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG VON FLUSSBASIERTER NETZWERKFUNKTIONSVERKETTUNG[2017/40]
English:METHOD TO OPTIMIZE FLOW-BASED NETWORK FUNCTION CHAINING[2017/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR L'OPTIMISATION DU CHAÎNAGE BASÉ SUR LES FLUX DE FONCTIONS D'UN RÉSEAU[2017/40]
Entry into regional phase14.06.2017National basic fee paid 
14.06.2017Search fee paid 
14.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
14.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
15.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2018Fee for grant paid
27.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]CN103607349  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * see the whole document *;
 [A]CN104050045  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * see the whole document *;
 [A]US2014229945  (BARKAI SHARON [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * see the whole document *