Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3224204

EP3224204 - PARTICLE SEPARATION IN METHOD FOR RECOVERING MAGNETITE FROM BAUXITE RESIDUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2018New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GMR, LLC
30 Westwood Drive
Worcester, MA 01609 / US
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / AMIRAN, Mohsen
303 S. Mount Prospect Road
Desplaines, IL 60016 / US
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Jones, Graham Henry
Graham Jones & Company
77 Beaconsfield Road
Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date15863838.724.11.2015
[2017/40]
WO2015US62383
Priority number, dateUS201462083549P24.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462083549 P
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016085961
Date:02.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3224204
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:C01G49/08, C22B34/12, C22B21/02, C01F7/06, C01G23/053, C22B1/00, C01B32/40
[2018/29]
Former International [2017/40]C01G49/08, C22B34/12, C22B21/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
TitleGerman:TEILCHENTRENNUNG IN EINEM VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON MAGNETIT AUS BAUXITRÜCKSTAND[2017/40]
English:PARTICLE SEPARATION IN METHOD FOR RECOVERING MAGNETITE FROM BAUXITE RESIDUE[2017/40]
French:SÉPARATION DES PARTICULES DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE MAGNÉTITE À PARTIR D'UN RÉSIDU DE BAUXITE[2017/40]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2017National basic fee paid 
23.05.2017Search fee paid 
23.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
23.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2012100004  (AMIRAN MOHSEN [US]) [X] 1-12 and 14 * Entire document, espcially, Abs, pg 4, para [0011] and [0012] Pg 8, para [0009]- [0011]; pg 9 para [0012], [0013] and [0014]; pg 10, [0015] and [0016], Please note Amiran starts to renumber paragraphs at page 6. * [Y] 13 and 15;
 [Y]US3804247  (MISCOVICH J) [Y] 13 and 15 * Entire document, espcially, Abs *;
 [A]US3205024  (WALTON MORLEY FREDERICK WILLIA, et al) [A] 1-15 * Entire document, espcially, Fig 1; col 1, In 65-67, Col 2, In 15-19; Col 3, In 1-18, 31-39 and 40-70; col 4 In 4 11 and ool 6, In 3 10 *;
 [A]US2009234174  (WESTMAN ANDREA L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * Entire document, especially para [0002], [0008], [0039] and [0040] *;
 [A]US3237429  (EDMOND HENRY-BIABAUD) [A] 1-15 * Entire document, especially col 1, In 57-67 *