Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3229515

EP3229515 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INDICATING CELL SPLITTING PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2017/41]
Inventor(s)01 / BYUN, Daewook
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / XU, Jian
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2017/41]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[2017/41]
Application number, filing date15865575.323.09.2015
[2017/41]
WO2015KR10025
Priority number, dateUS201462086124P01.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462086124 P
[2017/41]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016088995
Date:09.06.2016
Language:KO
[2016/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3229515
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR09.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/02, // H04W16/28, H04W88/08, H04W92/20
[2018/16]
Former International [2017/41]H04W16/24, H04W92/20, H04W88/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON ZELLENSPALTMUSTERN[2017/41]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INDICATING CELL SPLITTING PATTERN[2017/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR INDIQUER UN MOTIF DE DIVISION DE CELLULES[2017/41]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2016Translation filed 
05.09.2016National basic fee paid 
05.09.2016Search fee paid 
05.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/41]
05.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2014163553  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,2,7-11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0057] - [0064] - [0095] - [0106] - [0114] - [0117] * * figure 1 * [I] 3-6,12,13;
 [A]WO2014185695  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0053] - [0059] - [0111] - [0115] * * figure 6 *
 [XI]  - NSN, "Analysis of the AAS-based techniques", vol. RAN WG3, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20130819 - 20130823, (20130809), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-131317 SON_AAS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3_81/Docs/, (20130809), XP050719469 [X] 1,5-7,10,14 * abstract * * page 1 - page 3 * * section 2.2 / MRO * [I] 2-4,8,9,11-13,15
 [XAI]  - ERICSSON, "Analysis of SON for AAS cell splitting scenarios", vol. RAN WG3, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-140319-SON4AAS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN3/Docs/, (20140209), XP050738758 [X] 1,7,9,10,14 * abstract * * sections 2.1 and 2.2 * * figure 1 * [A] 5,6 [I] 2-4,8,11-13,15
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Use case considering multiple patterns for cell splitting", vol. RAN WG3, no. San Francisco, USA; 20141117 - 20141121, (20141117), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-142868 USE CASE CONSIDERING MULTIPLE PATTERNS FOR CELL SPLITTING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLI, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20141117), XP050877997 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]WO2014154277  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1, 2, 5-11, 14, 15 * See page 8, line 16-page 17, line 26; figures 3-8; and claim 1. *;
 [YA]  - ERICSSON, "Analysis of SON for AAS Cell Splitting Scenarios", R3-140319, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3 #83, Prague, Czech Republic, (20140201), XP050738758 [Y] 1, 2, 5-11, 14,15 * See pages 1, 2. * [A] 3, 4, 12, 13
 [Y]  - NSN, "Analysis of the AAS-Based Techniques", R3-131317, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3 Meeting #81, Barcelona, Spain, (20130809), XP050719469 [Y] 5, 6 * See pages 3-5. *
 [A]  - CATT et al., "Impact Analysis of AAS on SON", R3-131558, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3 Meeting #81, Barcelona, Spain, (20130822), XP050719688 [A] 1-15 * See pages 1-3. *
 [A]  - NEW POSTCOM, "Discussion on Intra- Cell Sectorization", R3-130898, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3 Meeting #80, Fukuoka, Japan, (20130511), XP050700983 [A] 1-15 * See pages 1-4. *