Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3231670

EP3231670 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  31.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd.
2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi
Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / HIROTSU, Teppei
c/o HITACHI, LTD.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
02 / ISHIDA, Ryosuke
c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD.
2520 Takaba
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date15866943.225.11.2015
[2017/42]
WO2015JP82966
Priority number, dateJP2014024949810.12.2014         Original published format: JP 2014249498
[2017/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016093055
Date:16.06.2016
Language:JA
[2016/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3231670
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/06, H04Q9/00, B60R16/023, G06F9/48, // H04L12/40
[2018/28]
Former International [2017/42]B60R16/02, B60R16/023, G06F9/48, H04L7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2017/42]
English:ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE[2017/42]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase31.05.2017Translation filed 
10.07.2017National basic fee paid 
10.07.2017Search fee paid 
10.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2005055469  (SCHEELE OLIVER [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0022] , [0023] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * [A] 2-6;
 [XA]US8495407  (WATANABE HIROKAZU [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 20 - line 38 * * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 41 * * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 6 * * column 10, line 36 - line 45 * * column 11, line 20 - line 24 * * column 11, line 43 - line 49 * * column 12, line 6 - line 30 * [A] 2-6;
 [X]DE102009054961  (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] *
International search[YA]JP2003040054  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [Y] 1 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0021]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 2-6;
 [YA]JP2007060400  (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al) [Y] 1 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0046]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) * [A] 2-6