Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3229788

EP3229788 - IMMEDIATE RELEASE ABUSE-DETERRENT GRANULATED DOSAGE FORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2018Supplementary search reportpublished on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cima Labs Inc.
7325 Aspen Lane
Brooklyn Park, Minnesota 55428 / US
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / HASWANI, Dinesh K.
5000 Merrimac Lane North
Plymouth, Minnesota 55446 / US
02 / MOE, Derek V.
1768 Lafayette Lane
Mound, Minnesota 55364 / US
03 / O'NEILL, Victoria A.
625 Ferndale Road North
Wayzata, Minnesota 55391 / US
04 / SEBURG, Randal A.
12986 88th Avenue North
Maple Grove, Minnesota 55369 / US
05 / VEGA ZEPEDA, Manuel A.
14118 Oakwood Road Ext.
Minnetonka, Minnesota 55345 / US
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date15867664.308.12.2015
[2017/42]
WO2015US64403
Priority number, dateUS201462088901P08.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462088901 P
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016094358
Date:16.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3229788
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/50, A61K9/52, A61K9/54
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
TitleGerman:MISSBRAUCHSVERHINDERNDE GRANULIERTE DOSIERFORMEN MIT UNMITTELBARER FREISETZUNG[2017/42]
English:IMMEDIATE RELEASE ABUSE-DETERRENT GRANULATED DOSAGE FORMS[2017/42]
French:FORMES GALÉNIQUES EN GRANULÉS À LIBÉRATION IMMÉDIATE, À EFFET ANTI-ABUS[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2017National basic fee paid 
28.06.2017Search fee paid 
28.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
28.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009311320  (OURY PASCAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * paragraph [0038] * * example - * [I] 8;
 [XP]WO2015065586  (CIMA LABS INC [US]) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2015066172  (CIMA LABS INC [US]) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2009059701  (ACINO PHARMA AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 12, paragraph 1 - paragraph l *
International search[XY]US2012321716  (VACHON MICHAEL [CA], et al) [X] 1, 3, 5 * ; figure 2; paragraphs [0002], [0011], [0015], [0023], [0061], [0064], [0067], [0080], [0094], [0115], [0186]; table 1 * [Y] 2, 4, 8, 19-20;
 [Y]WO2013128276  (RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L P [US], et al) [Y] 2, 6-20 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0023], [0083]-[0084], [00142]-[00143]; claims 12-14, 16-19; figure 2 *;
 [Y]WO2008024490  (THERAQUEST BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [Y] 4, 6-20 * ; abstract; paragraphs [00101], [00115], [00153], [00215]-[00216], [00255], [00259], [00383], [00386], [00410], [00414]; claims 6-7 *;
 [Y]US7375083  (MICKLE TRAVIS [US], et al) [Y] 18 * ; abstract; column 14, lines 35-45; column 15, lines 1-14; column 18, lines 49-55; column 20, lines 9-15, 40-47; column 28, lines 45-50 *;
 [A]US2013034503  (HOWARD WILLIAM WAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1 * ; entire document; especially abstract; figure 2; paragraphs [0025], [0138], [0154]-[0155] *;
 [PX]WO2015066172  (CIMA LABS INC [US]) [P, X] 1, 6 * ; entire document *;
 [PX]WO2015120201  (KASHIV PHARMA LLC [US]) [P, X] 1, 6 * ; entire document *