EP3230280 - PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF LULICONAZOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glenmark Life Sciences Limited Plot No 170-172 Chandramouli Industrial Estate Mohol Bazarpeth Solapur 413213 / IN | [2020/02] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited Glenmark House HDO-Corporate Bldg. Wing A, B.D. Sawant Marg Chakala, Andheri (East) Mumbai 400 099 / IN | ||
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited Glenmark Generics Limited Glenmark House HDO-Corporate Bldg Wing-A B.D. Sawant Marg, Chakala, Andheri (East) Mumbai 400 099 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHIRUD, Shekhar Bhaskar House No. 1101 Samarth Angan II A Wing Opposite Millat Nagar Lokhandwala Andheri West Mumbai Maharashtra 400053 / IN | 02 /
BHUSHAN, Kumar Hari S-276 SF Uppal's South End Avenue Sector 49 Haryana Gurgaon 122101 / IN | 03 /
ZHOPE, Sunil Sudhakar Flat No H1- 201 Nikash Lawns SR No. 140/3 Sus Road, Pashan Pune, Maharashtra (MH) Pune 411021 / IN | 04 /
GHADIGAONKAR, Shailesh Govind Flat No 409/C Maitri Chandan Maitri Vatika Kalwa(W) Thane Maharashtra 400605 / IN | 05 /
SINGH, Pardeep P.O Khera Kalmot Tehsil- Nangal Punjab Ropar 140117 / IN | 06 /
DESHMUKH, Shekhar Ashok Vrindavan colony Dhumalwadi Road Taluka-Akole Ahmednagar Maharashtra 422601 / IN | 07 /
CHAND, Prem 203A Sylvia Apartment Plot No. 23 Sector-8A, Airoli, Navi Maharashtra 400708 Mumbai / IN | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 15867840.9 | 09.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015IB59455 | Priority number, date | IN2014MUM3992 | 12.12.2014 Original published format: IN 3992MU2014 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016092478 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230280 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/06, A61K31/415, A61K31/4178, A61P31/00 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
C07B2200/13 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LULICONAZOL | [2017/42] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF LULICONAZOLE | [2017/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE LULICONAZOLE | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 11.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 26.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]KR20160061542 (KYONGBO PHARM CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-11* example -; claim - * | International search | [X]WO9702821 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 11-19, 21 * description, claims 4, 6-8, example 1 *; | [X]WO2010117091 (POLA PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [X] 11-15, 21 * description, example 1, table 1-3 *; | [XA]WO2014042231 (POLA PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [X] 11-15, 21 * description, example 1description, example 1 * [A] 1-10, 16-20; | [X]CN103012385 (VIWIT PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [X] 11-15, 21 * description, claims 1-13 *; | [XA]WO2014136282 (POLA PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [X] 11-15, 21 * description, claims 1-5description, claims 1-5 * [A] 1-10, 16-20 | by applicant | WO9702821 | WO2010117091 | CN103012385 | KR20160061542 | WO2014136282 |