Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3112909

EP3112909 - METHOD FOR POSITIONING TARGET IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL CT IMAGE AND SECURITY CHECK CT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuctech Company Limited
2nd Floor, Block A
TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2017/01]For all designated states
Nuctech Company Limited
2nd Fl. Block A Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Hadian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Zhiqiang
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Li
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
03 / WANG, Shuo
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
04 / SUN, Yunda
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
05 / HUANG, Qingping
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
06 / TANG, Zhi
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
 [2017/01]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/01]
Application number, filing date15869283.014.12.2015
[2017/01]
WO2015CN97274
Priority number, dateCN20141079506018.12.2014         Original published format: CN201410795060
[2017/01]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016095776
Date:23.06.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3112909
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN23.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01V5/00
[2017/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES ZIELS IN EINEM DREIDIMENSIONALEN CT-BILD UND CT-SYSTEM FÜR SICHERHEITSPRÜFUNG[2017/01]
English:METHOD FOR POSITIONING TARGET IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL CT IMAGE AND SECURITY CHECK CT SYSTEM[2017/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT DE CIBLE DANS UNE IMAGE CT TRIDIMENSIONNELLE, ET SYSTÈME CT DE VÉRIFICATION DE SÉCURITÉ[2017/01]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2016Translation filed 
29.09.2016National basic fee paid 
29.09.2016Search fee paid 
29.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/01]
29.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2011254845  (OIKAWA MICHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * [Y] 3;
 [XY]WO2013142072  (SIEMENS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,10 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0013] , [0043] , [0060] , [0062] , [0065] , [0085] , [0086]; figures 1A-H,3,17 * [Y] 2,3,9;
 [A]WO2010050952  (ANALOGIC CORP [US], et al) [A] 3,7 * paragraphs [0008] , [0043] , [0044] , [0046] , [0049] , [0050] , [5555]; figures 1-3 *
 [Y]  - RUSU R B ET AL, "Close-range scene segmentation and reconstruction of 3D point cloud maps for mobile manipulation in domestic environments", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, 2009. IROS 2009. IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091010), ISBN 978-1-4244-3803-7, pages 1 - 6, XP031581041 [Y] 2,3,9 * abstract *
International search[X]CN102222352  (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [X] 1, 2, 4-10 * description, paragraphs [0055] and [0056], and figures 8 and 9 *;
 [A]US2009079738  (LIAO SWANWA [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2713340  (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011046511  (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010050952  (ANALOGIC CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6721387  (NAIDU RAM [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *