Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3112852

EP3112852 - METHOD FOR POSITIONING TARGET IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL CT IMAGE AND SECURITY CHECK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuctech Company Limited
2nd Floor, Block A
TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2017/01]For all designated states
Nuctech Company Limited
2nd Fl. Block A Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Hadian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Zhiqiang
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Li
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
03 / WANG, Shuo
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
04 / SUN, Yunda
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
05 / HUANG, Qingping
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
06 / TANG, Zhi
2nd Floor Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
 [2017/01]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/01]
Application number, filing date15869305.115.12.2015
[2017/01]
WO2015CN97378
Priority number, dateCN20141079584018.12.2014         Original published format: CN201410795840
[2017/01]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016095798
Date:23.06.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3112852
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN23.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N23/04, G01V5/00
[2017/41]
Former International [2017/01]G01N23/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES ZIELS IN EINEM DREIDIMENSIONALEN CT-BILD UND CT-SYSTEM FÜR SICHERHEITSPRÜFUNG[2017/01]
English:METHOD FOR POSITIONING TARGET IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL CT IMAGE AND SECURITY CHECK SYSTEM[2017/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT DE CIBLE DANS UNE IMAGE CT TRIDIMENSIONNELLE, ET SYSTÈME DE VÉRIFICATION DE SÉCURITÉ[2017/01]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2016Translation filed 
29.09.2016National basic fee paid 
29.09.2016Search fee paid 
29.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/01]
29.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2960869  (NUCTECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0071] *;
 [A]US2008123895  (GABLE TODD [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0065] *
International search[X]CN102222352  (HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION) [X] 1, 6-7 * , description, paragraphs 0055-0056, and figures 6-9 *;
 [A]CN101592579  (THE FIRST RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF THE MINISTRY OF PUBLIC SECURITY OF P.R) [A] 1-9 * , the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010119690  (FUJIFILM CORPORATION) [A] 1-9 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2009079738  (LIAO, S.) [A] 1-9 * , the whole document *;
 [A]EP2713340  (TSINGHUA UNIVERSITY et al.) [A] 1-9 * , the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011046511  (AGENCY FOR SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY AND RESEARCH) [A] 1-9 * , the whole document *